Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1689 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 1689
1+By: Deshotel (Senate Sponsor - Miles) H.B. No. 1689
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019;
3+ April 15, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State
4+ Affairs; April 29, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
5+ Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 29, 2019, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to disclosure regarding the existence of a gestational
612 agreement in a suit for the dissolution of a marriage and standing
713 of an intended parent under a gestational agreement to file a suit
814 affecting the parent-child relationship.
915 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1016 SECTION 1. Section 6.406, Family Code, is amended by adding
1117 Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
1218 (a-1) If the parties to a suit for dissolution of a marriage
1319 are the intended parents under a gestational agreement that is in
1420 effect and that establishes a parent-child relationship between the
1521 parties as intended parents and an unborn child on the birth of the
1622 child, the petition in the suit for dissolution of a marriage shall
1723 state:
1824 (1) that the parties to the marriage have entered into
1925 a gestational agreement establishing a parent-child relationship
2026 between the parties as intended parents and an unborn child on the
2127 birth of the child;
2228 (2) whether the gestational mother under the agreement
2329 is pregnant or a child who is the subject of the agreement has been
2430 born; and
2531 (3) whether the agreement has been validated under
2632 Section 160.756.
2733 SECTION 2. Section 102.003, Family Code, is amended by
2834 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (d) to read as
2935 follows:
3036 (a) An original suit may be filed at any time by:
3137 (1) a parent of the child;
3238 (2) the child through a representative authorized by
3339 the court;
3440 (3) a custodian or person having the right of
3541 visitation with or access to the child appointed by an order of a
3642 court of another state or country;
3743 (4) a guardian of the person or of the estate of the
3844 child;
3945 (5) a governmental entity;
4046 (6) the Department of Family and Protective Services;
4147 (7) a licensed child placing agency;
4248 (8) a man alleging himself to be the father of a child
4349 filing in accordance with Chapter 160, subject to the limitations
4450 of that chapter, but not otherwise;
4551 (9) a person, other than a foster parent, who has had
4652 actual care, control, and possession of the child for at least six
4753 months ending not more than 90 days preceding the date of the filing
4854 of the petition;
4955 (10) a person designated as the managing conservator
5056 in a revoked or unrevoked affidavit of relinquishment under Chapter
5157 161 or to whom consent to adoption has been given in writing under
5258 Chapter 162;
5359 (11) a person with whom the child and the child's
5460 guardian, managing conservator, or parent have resided for at least
5561 six months ending not more than 90 days preceding the date of the
5662 filing of the petition if the child's guardian, managing
5763 conservator, or parent is deceased at the time of the filing of the
5864 petition;
5965 (12) a person who is the foster parent of a child
6066 placed by the Department of Family and Protective Services in the
6167 person's home for at least 12 months ending not more than 90 days
6268 preceding the date of the filing of the petition;
6369 (13) a person who is a relative of the child within the
6470 third degree by consanguinity, as determined by Chapter 573,
6571 Government Code, if the child's parents are deceased at the time of
6672 the filing of the petition; [or]
6773 (14) a person who has been named as a prospective
6874 adoptive parent of a child by a pregnant woman or the parent of the
6975 child, in a verified written statement to confer standing executed
7076 under Section 102.0035, regardless of whether the child has been
7177 born; or
7278 (15) subject to Subsection (d), a person who is an
7379 intended parent of a child or unborn child under a gestational
74- agreement that complies with the requirements of Section 160.754.
80+ agreement that substantially complies with the requirements of
81+ Section 160.754.
7582 (d) A person described by Subsection (a)(15) has standing to
7683 file an original suit only if:
7784 (1) the person is filing an original suit jointly with
7885 the other intended parent under the gestational agreement; or
7986 (2) the person is filing an original suit against the
8087 other intended parent under the gestational agreement.
8188 SECTION 3. Section 6.406, Family Code, as amended by this
8289 Act, applies only to a petition for dissolution of a marriage that
8390 is filed on or after the effective date of this Act. A petition for
8491 dissolution of a marriage that is filed before the effective date of
8592 this Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the petition is
8693 filed, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
8794 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
88- ______________________________ ______________________________
89- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
90- I certify that H.B. No. 1689 was passed by the House on April
91- 9, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 147, Nays 0, 1 present, not
92- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
93- No. 1689 on May 13, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 0,
94- 1 present, not voting.
95- ______________________________
96- Chief Clerk of the House
97- I certify that H.B. No. 1689 was passed by the Senate, with
98- amendments, on May 2, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
99- ______________________________
100- Secretary of the Senate
101- APPROVED: __________________
102- Date
103- __________________
104- Governor
95+ * * * * *