House
|
05/08/2019
|
Laid on the table subject to call
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Companion considered in lieu of SB 493
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Amendment withdrawn 1-S. Thompson
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Postponed 5/8/19 12:00 PM
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Postponed 5/8/19 11:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Amended 1-S. Thompson and Harless
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Postponed 5/7/19 3:15 PM
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Postponed 5/7/19 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Postponed 5/1/19 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2019
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|