House | 04/25/2019 | Laid on the table subject to call | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Companion considered in lieu of SB 812 | ||
House | 04/18/2019 | Postponed 4/25/19 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/18/2019 | Laid out as postponed business | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Postponed 4/18/19 10:00 AM | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Vote reconsidered | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Passed to engrossment as amended | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Amended 1-S. Thompson | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/08/2019 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/04/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/20/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2019 | Referred to Ways & Means | ||
House | 03/05/2019 | Read first time | ||
House | 02/14/2019 | Filed |