Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1865 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 04/30/2019

                    86R16794 JCG-D
 By: Landgraf, Thompson of Harris, Meyer, H.B. No. 1865
 Ortega, Harless, et al.


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the licensing and regulation of massage therapy;
 requiring a student permit; authorizing fees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 455.152, Occupations Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 455.152.  INELIGIBILITY FOR LICENSE.  [(a)] A person is
 not eligible for a license as a massage establishment, massage
 school, massage therapist, or massage therapy instructor if the
 person is an individual and has been convicted of, entered a plea of
 nolo contendere or guilty to, or received deferred adjudication for
 an offense under Chapter 20A, Penal Code, or Subchapter A, Chapter
 43, Penal Code, or another sexual offense.
 [(b)     A person convicted of a violation of this chapter is
 ineligible for a license as a massage establishment, massage
 school, massage therapist, or massage therapy instructor until the
 fifth anniversary of the date of the conviction.]
 SECTION 2.  Section 455.1525, Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 455.1525.  CRIMINAL HISTORY RECORD INFORMATION
 REQUIREMENT FOR LICENSE ISSUANCE [BACKGROUND CHECKS]. (a)  The
 department shall require an applicant for a license to submit a
 complete and legible set of fingerprints, on a form prescribed by
 the department, to the department or to the Department of Public
 Safety for the purpose of obtaining criminal history record
 information from the Department of Public Safety and the Federal
 Bureau of Investigation  [On receipt of an application for a license
 under this chapter, the department shall conduct a criminal
 background check on the applicant].
 (b)  The department may not issue a license to a person who
 does not comply with the requirement of Subsection (a).
 (c)  The department shall conduct a criminal history record
 information check of each applicant for a license using
 information:
 (1)  provided by the individual under this section; and
 (2)  made available to the department by the Department
 of Public Safety, the Federal Bureau of Investigation, and any
 other criminal justice agency under Chapter 411, Government Code.
 (d)  The department may:
 (1)  enter into an agreement with the Department of
 Public Safety to administer a criminal history record information
 check required under this section; and
 (2)  authorize the Department of Public Safety to
 collect from each applicant the costs incurred by the Department of
 Public Safety in conducting the criminal history record information
 check.
 (e)  For purposes of this section, if the applicant for a
 license is an entity, the applicant must submit fingerprints as
 required by Subsection (a) for each individual who:
 (1)  personally or constructively holds, including as
 the beneficiary of a trust:
 (A)  at least 10 percent of the entity's
 outstanding stock; or
 (B)  more than $25,000 of the fair market value of
 the entity;
 (2)  has the controlling interest in the entity;
 (3)  has a direct or indirect participating interest
 through shares, stock, or otherwise, regardless of whether voting
 rights are included, of more than 10 percent of the profits,
 proceeds, or capital gains of the entity;
 (4)  is a member of the board of directors or other
 governing body of the entity; or
 (5)  serves as:
 (A)  an elected officer of the entity; or
 (B)  a general manager of the entity.
 SECTION 3.  Section 455.160(h), Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (h)  On receipt of a request for a renewal of a license issued
 under this chapter, the department shall [may] conduct a criminal
 background check under Section 455.1525.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter D, Chapter 455, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 455.161 to read as follows:
 Sec. 455.161.  STUDENT PERMIT; ELIGIBILITY. (a) The
 department shall require a student enrolled in a massage school in
 this state to hold a permit stating the student's name and the name
 of the school.  The permit must be displayed in a reasonable manner
 at the school.
 (b)  The department shall issue a student permit to an
 applicant who submits an application to the department for a
 student permit accompanied by any required fee.
 (c)  An applicant for a student permit described by this
 section shall:
 (1)  submit an enrollment application to the department
 in a form and manner prescribed by the department; and
 (2)  satisfy other requirements specified by the
 department.
 SECTION 5.  Subchapter E, Chapter 455, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 455.2035 to read as follows:
 Sec. 455.2035.  REPORTS TO DEPARTMENT. (a) A massage school
 shall maintain a monthly progress report regarding each student
 attending the school.  The report must certify the daily attendance
 record of each student and the number of credit hours earned by each
 student during the previous month.
 (b)  On a student's completion of a prescribed course of
 instruction, the school shall notify the department that the
 student has completed the required number of hours and is eligible
 to take the appropriate examination.
 SECTION 6.  Section 455.158, Occupations Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 7.  Not later than March 1, 2020, the Texas
 Commission of Licensing and Regulation shall adopt rules necessary
 to implement the changes in law made by this Act to Chapter 455,
 Occupations Code.
 SECTION 8.  (a)  Section 455.1525, Occupations Code, as
 amended by this Act, applies only to an application for a license
 submitted on or after the effective date of this Act. An
 application for a license submitted before that date is governed by
 the law in effect on the date the application was submitted, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 (b)  Not later than September 1, 2021, the Texas Department
 of Licensing and Regulation shall obtain criminal history record
 information on each person who, on the effective date of this Act,
 holds a license issued under Chapter 455, Occupations Code, and did
 not undergo a criminal history record information check based on
 the license holder's fingerprints on initial application for the
 license. The department may suspend the license of a license holder
 who does not provide the criminal history record information as
 required by the department and this subsection.
 SECTION 9.  Section 455.160(h), Occupations Code, as amended
 by this Act, applies only to an application for the renewal of a
 license submitted on or after the effective date of this Act.  An
 application submitted before that date is governed by the law in
 effect on the date the application was submitted, and the former law
 is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 10.  (a) In this section, "massage school" has the
 meaning assigned by Section 455.001, Occupations Code.
 (b)  Section 455.161, Occupations Code, as added by this Act,
 applies to a student who is enrolled in a massage school on or after
 June 1, 2020.
 SECTION 11.  (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of
 this section, this Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 (b)  Section 455.2035, Occupations Code, as added by this
 Act, takes effect July 1, 2020.