Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1865 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 1865
1+By: Landgraf, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 1865
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 30, 2019;
3+ May 3, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
4+ Commerce; May 20, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
5+ Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 20, 2019, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to the licensing and regulation of massage therapy;
612 requiring a student permit; authorizing fees.
713 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
814 SECTION 1. Section 455.152, Occupations Code, is amended to
915 read as follows:
1016 Sec. 455.152. INELIGIBILITY FOR LICENSE. [(a)] A person is
1117 not eligible for a license as a massage establishment, massage
1218 school, massage therapist, or massage therapy instructor if the
1319 person is an individual and has been convicted of, entered a plea of
1420 nolo contendere or guilty to, or received deferred adjudication for
1521 an offense under Chapter 20A, Penal Code, or Subchapter A, Chapter
1622 43, Penal Code, or another sexual offense.
1723 [(b) A person convicted of a violation of this chapter is
1824 ineligible for a license as a massage establishment, massage
1925 school, massage therapist, or massage therapy instructor until the
2026 fifth anniversary of the date of the conviction.]
2127 SECTION 2. Section 455.1525, Occupations Code, is amended
2228 to read as follows:
2329 Sec. 455.1525. CRIMINAL HISTORY RECORD INFORMATION
2430 REQUIREMENT FOR LICENSE ISSUANCE [BACKGROUND CHECKS]. (a) The
2531 department shall require an applicant for a license to submit a
2632 complete and legible set of fingerprints, on a form prescribed by
2733 the department, to the department or to the Department of Public
2834 Safety for the purpose of obtaining criminal history record
2935 information from the Department of Public Safety and the Federal
3036 Bureau of Investigation [On receipt of an application for a license
3137 under this chapter, the department shall conduct a criminal
3238 background check on the applicant].
3339 (b) The department may not issue a license to a person who
3440 does not comply with the requirement of Subsection (a).
3541 (c) The department shall conduct a criminal history record
3642 information check of each applicant for a license using
3743 information:
3844 (1) provided by the individual under this section; and
3945 (2) made available to the department by the Department
4046 of Public Safety, the Federal Bureau of Investigation, and any
4147 other criminal justice agency under Chapter 411, Government Code.
4248 (d) The department may:
4349 (1) enter into an agreement with the Department of
4450 Public Safety to administer a criminal history record information
4551 check required under this section; and
4652 (2) authorize the Department of Public Safety to
4753 collect from each applicant the costs incurred by the Department of
4854 Public Safety in conducting the criminal history record information
4955 check.
5056 (e) For purposes of this section, if the applicant for a
5157 license is an entity, the applicant must submit fingerprints as
5258 required by Subsection (a) for each individual who:
5359 (1) personally or constructively holds, including as
5460 the beneficiary of a trust:
5561 (A) at least 10 percent of the entity's
5662 outstanding stock; or
5763 (B) more than $25,000 of the fair market value of
5864 the entity;
5965 (2) has the controlling interest in the entity;
6066 (3) has a direct or indirect participating interest
6167 through shares, stock, or otherwise, regardless of whether voting
6268 rights are included, of more than 10 percent of the profits,
6369 proceeds, or capital gains of the entity;
6470 (4) is a member of the board of directors or other
6571 governing body of the entity; or
6672 (5) serves as:
6773 (A) an elected officer of the entity; or
6874 (B) a general manager of the entity.
6975 SECTION 3. Section 455.160(h), Occupations Code, is amended
7076 to read as follows:
7177 (h) On receipt of a request for a renewal of a license issued
7278 under this chapter, the department shall [may] conduct a criminal
7379 background check under Section 455.1525.
7480 SECTION 4. Subchapter D, Chapter 455, Occupations Code, is
7581 amended by adding Section 455.161 to read as follows:
7682 Sec. 455.161. STUDENT PERMIT; ELIGIBILITY. (a) The
7783 department shall require a student enrolled in a massage school in
7884 this state to hold a permit stating the student's name and the name
7985 of the school. The permit must be displayed in a reasonable manner
8086 at the school.
8187 (b) The department shall issue a student permit to an
8288 applicant who submits an application to the department for a
8389 student permit accompanied by any required fee.
8490 (c) An applicant for a student permit described by this
8591 section shall:
8692 (1) submit an enrollment application to the department
8793 in a form and manner prescribed by the department; and
8894 (2) satisfy other requirements specified by the
8995 department.
9096 SECTION 5. Subchapter E, Chapter 455, Occupations Code, is
9197 amended by adding Section 455.2035 to read as follows:
9298 Sec. 455.2035. REPORTS TO DEPARTMENT. (a) A massage school
9399 shall maintain a monthly progress report regarding each student
94100 attending the school. The report must certify the daily attendance
95101 record of each student and the number of credit hours earned by each
96102 student during the previous month.
97103 (b) On a student's completion of a prescribed course of
98104 instruction, the school shall notify the department that the
99105 student has completed the required number of hours and is eligible
100106 to take the appropriate examination.
101107 SECTION 6. Section 455.158, Occupations Code, is repealed.
102108 SECTION 7. Not later than March 1, 2020, the Texas
103109 Commission of Licensing and Regulation shall adopt rules necessary
104110 to implement the changes in law made by this Act to Chapter 455,
105111 Occupations Code.
106112 SECTION 8. (a) Section 455.1525, Occupations Code, as
107113 amended by this Act, applies only to an application for a license
108114 submitted on or after the effective date of this Act. An
109115 application for a license submitted before that date is governed by
110116 the law in effect on the date the application was submitted, and the
111117 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
112118 (b) Not later than September 1, 2021, the Texas Department
113119 of Licensing and Regulation shall obtain criminal history record
114120 information on each person who, on the effective date of this Act,
115121 holds a license issued under Chapter 455, Occupations Code, and did
116122 not undergo a criminal history record information check based on
117123 the license holder's fingerprints on initial application for the
118124 license. The department may suspend the license of a license holder
119125 who does not provide the criminal history record information as
120126 required by the department and this subsection.
121127 SECTION 9. Section 455.160(h), Occupations Code, as amended
122128 by this Act, applies only to an application for the renewal of a
123129 license submitted on or after the effective date of this Act. An
124130 application submitted before that date is governed by the law in
125131 effect on the date the application was submitted, and the former law
126132 is continued in effect for that purpose.
127133 SECTION 10. (a) In this section, "massage school" has the
128134 meaning assigned by Section 455.001, Occupations Code.
129135 (b) Section 455.161, Occupations Code, as added by this Act,
130136 applies to a student who is enrolled in a massage school on or after
131137 June 1, 2020.
132138 SECTION 11. (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of
133139 this section, this Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
134140 (b) Section 455.2035, Occupations Code, as added by this
135141 Act, takes effect July 1, 2020.
136- ______________________________ ______________________________
137- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
138- I certify that H.B. No. 1865 was passed by the House on April
139- 30, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 121, Nays 25, 1 present, not
140- voting.
141- ______________________________
142- Chief Clerk of the House
143- I certify that H.B. No. 1865 was passed by the Senate on May
144- 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 25, Nays 6.
145- ______________________________
146- Secretary of the Senate
147- APPROVED: _____________________
148- Date
149- _____________________
150- Governor
142+ * * * * *