Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1891 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2019

                    By: Stucky (Senate Sponsor - Powell) H.B. No. 1891
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 16, 2019;
 April 17, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 19, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an exemption from the assessment requirements of the
 Texas Success Initiative for students who achieve a certain score
 on a high school equivalency examination.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 51.338, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (h) to read as follows:
 (h)  A student who has achieved a score set by the board on a
 high school equivalency examination administered under Section
 7.111 is exempt from the requirements of this subchapter.  The
 commissioner of higher education by rule shall establish the period
 for which an exemption under this subsection is valid.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies
 beginning with the assessment of entering undergraduate students at
 public institutions of higher education for the 2020 fall semester.
 The assessment of an entering undergraduate student for an academic
 term before that semester is governed by the law in effect before
 the effective date of this Act, and that law is continued in effect
 for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *