Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1894 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/09/2019

                    By: Goldman (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 1894
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 16, 2019;
 April 17, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business & Commerce; May 9, 2019, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; May 9, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1894 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the repeal of the criminal penalty for a violation of
 the interior designers licensing law.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter H, Chapter 1053, Occupations Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 2.  The repeal by this Act of Subchapter H, Chapter
 1053, Occupations Code, does not apply to an offense committed
 under that subchapter before the effective date of the repeal.  An
 offense committed before the effective date of the repeal is
 governed by the law as it existed on the date the offense was
 committed, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.  For purposes of this section, an offense was committed
 before the effective date of the repeal if any element of the
 offense occurred before that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *