1 | | - | H.B. No. 1894 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Goldman (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 1894 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 16, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 17, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 4 | + | Business & Commerce; May 9, 2019, reported adversely, with |
---|
| 5 | + | favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, |
---|
| 6 | + | Nays 0; May 9, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1894 By: Hancock |
---|
12 | 19 | | 1053, Occupations Code, does not apply to an offense committed |
---|
13 | 20 | | under that subchapter before the effective date of the repeal. An |
---|
14 | 21 | | offense committed before the effective date of the repeal is |
---|
15 | 22 | | governed by the law as it existed on the date the offense was |
---|
16 | 23 | | committed, and the former law is continued in effect for that |
---|
17 | 24 | | purpose. For purposes of this section, an offense was committed |
---|
18 | 25 | | before the effective date of the repeal if any element of the |
---|
19 | 26 | | offense occurred before that date. |
---|
20 | 27 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
21 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
22 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
23 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1894 was passed by the House on April |
---|
24 | | - | 16, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0, 2 present, not |
---|
25 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
26 | | - | No. 1894 on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 1, |
---|
27 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
28 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
29 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
30 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1894 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
31 | | - | amendments, on May 15, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
32 | | - | 0. |
---|
33 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
34 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
35 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
36 | | - | Date |
---|
37 | | - | __________________ |
---|
38 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 28 | + | * * * * * |
---|