House | 05/01/2019 | Postponed 9/1/20 10:00 AM | ||
House | 05/01/2019 | Laid out as postponed business | ||
House | 05/01/2019 | Postponed 5/1/19 3:30 PM | ||
House | 05/01/2019 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/29/2019 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/25/2019 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/02/2019 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/01/2019 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2019 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2019 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2019 | Referred to Urban Affairs | ||
House | 03/05/2019 | Read first time | ||
House | 02/15/2019 | Filed |