Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB19 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 16, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 15, 2019
Bill April 3, 2019