Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1900 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/06/2019

                    By: Bonnen of Galveston (Senate Sponsor - Taylor) H.B. No. 1900
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019;
 April 24, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business & Commerce; May 6, 2019, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 6, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to replacement cost coverage in policies issued by the
 Texas Windstorm Insurance Association.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 2210.207(c) and (d), Insurance Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (c)  If, on the effective date of an association policy [at
 the time of loss], the total amount of insurance applicable to a
 dwelling is equal to 80 percent or more of the full replacement cost
 of the dwelling or equal to the maximum amount of insurance
 otherwise available through the association, coverage applicable
 to the dwelling under the policy is extended to include the full
 cost of repair or replacement, without a deduction for
 depreciation.
 (d)  If, on the effective date of an association policy [at
 the time of loss], the total amount of insurance applicable to a
 dwelling is equal to less than 80 percent of the full replacement
 cost of the dwelling and less than the maximum amount of insurance
 available through the association, liability for loss under the
 policy may not exceed the replacement cost of the part of the
 dwelling that is damaged or destroyed, less depreciation.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter L-1, Chapter 2210, Insurance Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2210.5741 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2210.5741.  REPLACEMENT COST COVERAGE CLAIM
 PROCESSING. (a)  After the association accepts coverage for a
 claim in full or in part, a claimant whose association policy
 includes replacement cost coverage for the claim may request the
 replacement cost payment by submitting to the association
 documentation of the cost and completion of the repairs related to
 the claim not later than the 545th day after the date the claimant
 receives a notification under Section 2210.573(d)(1) or (2).
 (b)  Not later than the 30th day after the date the
 association receives documentation under Subsection (a), the
 association shall provide the claimant, in writing, notification
 of:
 (1)  the amount of the replacement cost payment the
 association will make; and
 (2)  the deadline to request appraisal under this
 section.
 (c)  The association shall pay the amount described by
 Subsection (b)(1) not later than the 10th day after the date
 notification is provided under Subsection (b).
 (d)  If a claimant has not demanded appraisal with respect to
 a claim under Section 2210.574 and the claimant disputes the
 replacement cost amount the association will pay with respect to
 the claim, the claimant may demand appraisal of the replacement
 cost amount not later than the 30th day after the date the claimant
 receives the notification under Subsection (b).  A claimant may
 demand appraisal under this section without regard to whether all
 repairs related to the claim are complete.
 (e)  Except with respect to the deadlines applicable to an
 appraisal under this section, the appraisal under this section
 shall be conducted in the same manner as an appraisal demanded under
 Section 2210.574.
 (f)  If a claimant's association policy includes replacement
 cost coverage, the written notification provided to the claimant
 under Section 2210.573(d)(1) or (2) must notify the claimant of the
 deadlines under this section for:
 (1)  completing repairs and submitting documentation
 under Subsection (a); and
 (2)  demanding appraisal under this section.
 SECTION 3.  Section 2210.581, Insurance Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a) and (b) and adding Subsection (d) to read
 as follows:
 (a)  Subject to Subsection (b), the commissioner, on a
 showing of good cause, may by rule extend any deadline established
 under this subchapter and set the number of days by which the
 deadline is extended.
 (b)  The [With reference to claims filed during a particular
 catastrophe year, the] extension of deadlines under Subsection (a)
 related to claims arising from a particular storm may not exceed 120
 days in the aggregate for deadlines applicable only to the
 association.  The limitation on extensions under this subsection
 does not apply to the extension of a deadline imposed on a claimant,
 or on both a claimant and the association.
 (d)  The commissioner shall adopt rules as necessary to
 implement this section. Section 2001.0045, Government Code, does
 not apply to rules adopted under this section.
 SECTION 4.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 an insurance policy delivered, issued for delivery, or renewed on
 or after January 1, 2020. A policy delivered, issued for delivery,
 or renewed before January 1, 2020, is governed by the law as it
 existed immediately before the effective date of this Act, and that
 law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *