Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1900 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 18, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 6, 2019
Bill April 8, 2019