1 | | - | H.B. No. 191 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Stephenson, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 191 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 23, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 24, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Water & |
---|
| 4 | + | Rural Affairs; May 13, 2019, reported favorably by the following |
---|
| 5 | + | vote: Yeas 5, Nays 1; May 13, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 11 | | relating to the disposal of pesticides. |
---|
6 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
7 | 13 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 76, Agriculture Code, is |
---|
8 | 14 | | amended by adding Section 76.009 to read as follows: |
---|
9 | 15 | | Sec. 76.009. PESTICIDE DISPOSAL FUND. (a) The pesticide |
---|
10 | 16 | | disposal fund is a fund in the state treasury outside the general |
---|
11 | 17 | | revenue fund. The fund consists of: |
---|
12 | 18 | | (1) money deposited to the credit of the fund under |
---|
13 | 19 | | Section 76.044; and |
---|
14 | 20 | | (2) interest earned on the investment of money in the |
---|
15 | 21 | | fund. |
---|
16 | 22 | | (b) The department shall administer the fund. Money in the |
---|
17 | 23 | | fund may be appropriated only for the purposes of the pesticide |
---|
18 | 24 | | waste and pesticide container collection activities performed |
---|
19 | 25 | | under Section 76.132. |
---|
20 | 26 | | SECTION 2. Section 76.044, Agriculture Code, is amended by |
---|
21 | 27 | | adding Subsection (c) to read as follows: |
---|
22 | 28 | | (c) Of the money received by the department under this |
---|
23 | 29 | | section, the department shall annually deposit to the credit of the |
---|
24 | 30 | | pesticide disposal fund under Section 76.009 an amount to cover the |
---|
25 | 31 | | cost of administering the pesticide waste and pesticide container |
---|
26 | 32 | | collection activities performed under Section 76.132, not to exceed |
---|
27 | 33 | | $400,000. The department may not increase the amount of a fee under |
---|
28 | 34 | | this section for purposes of this subsection or Section 76.132. |
---|
29 | 35 | | SECTION 3. Subchapter F, Chapter 76, Agriculture Code, is |
---|
30 | 36 | | amended by adding Section 76.132 to read as follows: |
---|
31 | 37 | | Sec. 76.132. DISPOSAL OF PESTICIDE. The department, in |
---|
32 | 38 | | coordination with the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality and |
---|
33 | 39 | | the Texas A&M AgriLife Extension Service, shall organize pesticide |
---|
34 | 40 | | waste and pesticide container collection activities statewide. The |
---|
35 | 41 | | department, the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality, and the |
---|
36 | 42 | | Texas A&M AgriLife Extension Service may contract for the services |
---|
37 | 43 | | of contractors that are licensed in the disposal of hazardous waste |
---|
38 | 44 | | under Section 401.202, Health and Safety Code, or other contractors |
---|
39 | 45 | | to implement the pesticide waste and pesticide container collection |
---|
40 | 46 | | activities and facilitate the collection of canceled, |
---|
41 | 47 | | unregistered, or otherwise unwanted pesticide products and |
---|
42 | 48 | | pesticide containers. |
---|
43 | | - | SECTION 4. The Texas Department of Agriculture is required |
---|
44 | | - | to implement a provision of this Act only if the legislature |
---|
45 | | - | appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If the |
---|
46 | | - | legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that |
---|
47 | | - | purpose, the department may, but is not required to, implement a |
---|
48 | | - | provision of this Act using other appropriations available for that |
---|
49 | | - | purpose. |
---|
50 | | - | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
51 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
52 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
53 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 191 was passed by the House on April |
---|
54 | | - | 17, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 129, Nays 11, 2 present, not |
---|
55 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
56 | | - | No. 191 on May 23, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 125, Nays 16, |
---|
57 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
58 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
59 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
60 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 191 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
61 | | - | amendments, on May 16, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 25, Nays |
---|
62 | | - | 6. |
---|
63 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
64 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
65 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
66 | | - | Date |
---|
67 | | - | __________________ |
---|
68 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 49 | + | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
| 50 | + | * * * * * |
---|