House
|
05/10/2019
|
Laid on the table subject to call
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Companion considered in lieu of SB 755
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2019
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2019
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2019
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|