1 | | - | H.B. No. 1941 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Phelan, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 1941 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 10, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Business & |
---|
| 4 | + | Commerce; May 17, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 1; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 17, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 1941 By: Nichols |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to unconscionable prices charged by certain health care |
---|
6 | 14 | | facilities for medical care. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 17, Business & Commerce |
---|
9 | 17 | | Code, is amended by adding Section 17.464 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 18 | | Sec. 17.464. UNCONSCIONABLE PRICE FOR CARE AT EMERGENCY |
---|
11 | 19 | | FACILITY. (a) In this section: |
---|
12 | 20 | | (1) "Emergency care" means health care services |
---|
13 | 21 | | provided in an emergency facility to evaluate and stabilize medical |
---|
14 | 22 | | conditions of a recent onset and severity, including severe pain, |
---|
15 | 23 | | that would lead a prudent layperson possessing an average knowledge |
---|
16 | 24 | | of medicine and health to believe that the individual's condition, |
---|
17 | 25 | | sickness, or injury is of such a nature that failure to get |
---|
18 | 26 | | immediate medical care could: |
---|
19 | 27 | | (A) place the individual's health in serious |
---|
20 | 28 | | jeopardy; |
---|
21 | 29 | | (B) result in serious impairment to bodily |
---|
22 | 30 | | functions; |
---|
23 | 31 | | (C) result in serious dysfunction of a bodily |
---|
24 | 32 | | organ or part; |
---|
25 | 33 | | (D) result in serious disfigurement; or |
---|
26 | 34 | | (E) for a pregnant woman, result in serious |
---|
27 | 35 | | jeopardy to the health of the fetus. |
---|
32 | | - | (ii) a hospital that does not meet the |
---|
33 | | - | conditions of participation for certification under Title XVIII of |
---|
34 | | - | the Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. Section 1395 et seq.); and |
---|
35 | | - | (B) does not include a hospital that: |
---|
36 | | - | (i) has been operating as a hospital for |
---|
37 | | - | less than one year; |
---|
38 | | - | (ii) has submitted an application to a |
---|
39 | | - | federally recognized accreditation program for certification under |
---|
40 | | - | Title XVIII of the Social Security Act (42 U.S.C. Section 1395 et |
---|
41 | | - | seq.); and |
---|
42 | | - | (iii) has not failed an accreditation for |
---|
43 | | - | certification. |
---|
| 39 | + | (B) a hospital that does not meet the conditions |
---|
| 40 | + | of participation for certification under Title XVIII of the Social |
---|
| 41 | + | Security Act (42 U.S.C. Section 1395 et seq.). |
---|
44 | 42 | | (b) For purposes of Section 17.46(a), the term "false, |
---|
45 | 43 | | misleading, or deceptive acts or practices" includes an emergency |
---|
46 | 44 | | facility that: |
---|
47 | 45 | | (1) provides emergency care at an unconscionable |
---|
48 | 46 | | price; or |
---|
49 | 47 | | (2) demands or charges an unconscionable price for or |
---|
50 | 48 | | in connection with emergency care or other care at the facility. |
---|
51 | 49 | | (c) The consumer protection division may not bring an action |
---|
52 | 50 | | under Section 17.47 for an act or practice described by Subsection |
---|
53 | 51 | | (b) if the price alleged to be unconscionable is less than 200 |
---|
54 | 52 | | percent of the average charge for the same or substantially similar |
---|
55 | 53 | | care provided to other individuals by emergency rooms of hospitals |
---|
56 | 54 | | located in the same county or nearest county in which the emergency |
---|
57 | 55 | | facility is located, as applicable, according to data collected by |
---|
58 | 56 | | the Department of State Health Services under Chapter 108, Health |
---|
59 | 57 | | and Safety Code, and made available to the division, except as |
---|
60 | 58 | | provided by Subsection (d). The consumer protection division may |
---|
61 | 59 | | not use data that includes prices for care provided in an urgent |
---|
62 | 60 | | care setting or physician practice to establish the division's |
---|
63 | 61 | | authority to investigate and pursue an action under this |
---|
64 | 62 | | subchapter. |
---|
65 | 63 | | (d) If the attorney general determines that the consumer |
---|
66 | 64 | | protection division is unable to obtain the charge data described |
---|
67 | 65 | | by Subsection (c), the attorney general may adopt rules designating |
---|
68 | 66 | | another source of hospital charge data for use by the division in |
---|
69 | 67 | | establishing the average charge for emergency care or other care |
---|
70 | 68 | | provided by hospital emergency rooms for purposes of Subsection |
---|
71 | 69 | | (c). |
---|
72 | 70 | | (e) In an action brought under Section 17.47 to enforce this |
---|
73 | 71 | | section, the consumer protection division may request, and the |
---|
74 | 72 | | trier of fact may award the recovery of: |
---|
75 | 73 | | (1) reasonable attorney's fees and court costs; and |
---|
76 | 74 | | (2) the reasonable expenses incurred by the division |
---|
77 | 75 | | in obtaining any remedy available under Section 17.47, including |
---|
78 | 76 | | the cost of investigation, witness fees, and deposition expenses. |
---|
79 | 77 | | (f) This section does not create a private cause of action |
---|
80 | 78 | | for a false, misleading, or deceptive act or practice described by |
---|
81 | 79 | | Subsection (b). |
---|
82 | 80 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
83 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
84 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
85 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1941 was passed by the House on May 8, |
---|
86 | | - | 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 147, Nays 0, 1 present, not |
---|
87 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
88 | | - | No. 1941 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 1, |
---|
89 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
90 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
91 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
92 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 1941 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
93 | | - | amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays |
---|
94 | | - | 1. |
---|
95 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
96 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
97 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
98 | | - | Date |
---|
99 | | - | __________________ |
---|
100 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 81 | + | * * * * * |
---|