House
|
04/30/2019
|
Laid on the table subject to call
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
Companion considered in lieu of CSSB 2
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Postponed 4/30/19 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2019
|
Postponed 4/24/19 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2019
|
Postponed 4/15/19 10:00 AM
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2019
|
Placed on Emergency Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Calendars Committee rule adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2019
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2019
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2019
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2019
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|