1 | | - | H.B. No. 2050 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Paddie, Price (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 2050 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 2, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 3, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health & |
---|
| 4 | + | Human Services; May 16, 2019, reported favorably by the following |
---|
| 5 | + | vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 16, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
12 | 18 | | (c) Subject to Subsection (c-1), consent [Consent] to the |
---|
13 | 19 | | prescription of psychoactive medication given by a resident or by a |
---|
14 | 20 | | person authorized by law to consent on behalf of the resident is |
---|
15 | 21 | | valid only if: |
---|
16 | 22 | | (1) the consent is given voluntarily and without |
---|
17 | 23 | | coercive or undue influence; |
---|
18 | 24 | | (2) the person prescribing the medication, [or] that |
---|
19 | 25 | | person's designee, or the facility's medical director provided the |
---|
20 | 26 | | following information, in a standard format approved by the |
---|
21 | 27 | | department, to the resident and, if applicable, to the person |
---|
22 | 28 | | authorized by law to consent on behalf of the resident: |
---|
23 | 29 | | (A) the specific condition to be treated; |
---|
24 | 30 | | (B) the beneficial effects on that condition |
---|
25 | 31 | | expected from the medication; |
---|
26 | 32 | | (C) the probable clinically significant side |
---|
27 | 33 | | effects and risks associated with the medication; and |
---|
28 | 34 | | (D) the proposed course of the medication; |
---|
29 | 35 | | (3) the resident and, if appropriate, the person |
---|
30 | 36 | | authorized by law to consent on behalf of the resident are informed |
---|
31 | 37 | | in writing that consent may be revoked; and |
---|
32 | 38 | | (4) the consent is evidenced in the resident's |
---|
33 | 39 | | clinical record by: |
---|
34 | 40 | | (A) a signed form prescribed by the facility or |
---|
35 | 41 | | by a statement of the person prescribing the medication or that |
---|
36 | 42 | | person's designee that documents that consent was given by the |
---|
37 | 43 | | appropriate person and the circumstances under which the consent |
---|
38 | 44 | | was obtained; and |
---|
39 | 45 | | (B) the original or a copy of the written consent |
---|
40 | 46 | | required by Subsection (c-1), if applicable. |
---|
41 | 47 | | (c-1) In addition to the requirements of Subsection (c), |
---|
42 | 48 | | consent to the prescription of an antipsychotic or neuroleptic |
---|
43 | 49 | | medication is valid only if the consent to the prescription of that |
---|
44 | 50 | | medication is given in writing, on a form prescribed by the |
---|
45 | 51 | | commission, by a resident or by a person authorized by law to |
---|
46 | 52 | | consent on behalf of the resident. |
---|
47 | 53 | | (c-2) Written consent provided by a resident or the |
---|
48 | 54 | | resident's legally authorized representative on the form described |
---|
49 | | - | by Subsection (c-1) satisfies the consent requirements of |
---|
50 | | - | Subsection (c). |
---|
51 | | - | (c-3) There is a rebuttable presumption that the written |
---|
52 | | - | consent provided by a resident or the resident's legally authorized |
---|
53 | | - | representative on the form described by Subsection (c-1) satisfies |
---|
54 | | - | the disclosure requirements established by the Texas Medical |
---|
55 | | - | Disclosure Panel in Sections 74.104 and 74.105, Civil Practice and |
---|
56 | | - | Remedies Code. |
---|
| 55 | + | by Subsection (c-1) is presumed to satisfy the consent requirements |
---|
| 56 | + | of Subsection (c) and the disclosure requirements established by |
---|
| 57 | + | the Texas Medical Disclosure Panel in Sections 74.103 and 74.105, |
---|
| 58 | + | Civil Practice and Remedies Code. |
---|
57 | 59 | | SECTION 2. As soon as practicable after the effective date |
---|
58 | 60 | | of this Act, the executive commissioner of the Health and Human |
---|
59 | 61 | | Services Commission shall develop the form required by Section |
---|
60 | 62 | | 242.505(c-1), Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act. In |
---|
61 | 63 | | developing the form, the commission shall consult with the Texas |
---|
62 | 64 | | Medical Disclosure Panel. |
---|
63 | 65 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
64 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
65 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
66 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2050 was passed by the House on May 2, |
---|
67 | | - | 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 2, 1 present, not |
---|
68 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
69 | | - | No. 2050 on May 23, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 0, |
---|
70 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
71 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
72 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
73 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2050 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
74 | | - | amendments, on May 19, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
75 | | - | 0. |
---|
76 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
77 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
78 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
79 | | - | Date |
---|
80 | | - | __________________ |
---|
81 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 66 | + | * * * * * |
---|