Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2059 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 2059
1+By: Blanco (Senate Sponsor - Taylor) H.B. No. 2059
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 13, 2019;
3+ May 14, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
4+ Human Services; May 20, 2019, reported favorably by the following
5+ vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 20, 2019, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to required human trafficking prevention training as a
612 condition of registration permit or license renewal for certain
713 health care practitioners.
814 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
915 SECTION 1. Subtitle A, Title 3, Occupations Code, is
1016 amended by adding Chapter 116 to read as follows:
1117 CHAPTER 116. TRAINING COURSE ON HUMAN TRAFFICKING PREVENTION
1218 Sec. 116.001. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
1319 (1) "Commission" means the Health and Human Services
1420 Commission.
1521 (2) "Executive commissioner" means the executive
1622 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission.
1723 (3) "Health care practitioner" means an individual who
1824 holds a license, certificate, permit, or other authorization issued
1925 under this title to engage in a health care profession and who
2026 provides direct patient care.
2127 Sec. 116.002. REQUIRED TRAINING COURSE ON HUMAN TRAFFICKING
2228 PREVENTION FOR CERTAIN HEALTH CARE PROVIDERS. (a) A health care
2329 practitioner, other than a physician or nurse, within the time
2430 prescribed by commission rule shall successfully complete a
2531 training course approved by the executive commissioner on
2632 identifying and assisting victims of human trafficking.
2733 (b) The executive commissioner shall:
2834 (1) approve training courses on human trafficking
2935 prevention, including at least one course that is available without
3036 charge; and
3137 (2) post a list of the approved training courses on the
3238 commission's Internet website.
3339 (c) The executive commissioner shall update the list of
3440 approved training courses described by Subsection (b) as necessary
3541 and consider for approval training courses conducted by health care
3642 facilities.
3743 Sec. 116.003. TRAINING REQUIRED FOR LICENSE RENEWAL. A
3844 health care practitioner, other than a physician or nurse, shall
3945 successfully complete a training course described by Section
4046 116.002 as a condition for renewal of a license issued to the health
4147 care practitioner under this title.
4248 SECTION 2. Subchapter B, Chapter 156, Occupations Code, is
4349 amended by adding Section 156.060 to read as follows:
4450 Sec. 156.060. CONTINUING EDUCATION IN HUMAN TRAFFICKING
4551 PREVENTION. (a) A physician licensed under this subtitle who
4652 submits an application for renewal of a registration permit and who
4753 designates a direct patient care practice must complete, as part of
4854 the hours of continuing medical education required for compliance
4955 with Section 156.051(a)(2), a human trafficking prevention course
5056 approved by the executive commissioner of the Health and Human
5157 Services Commission under Section 116.002.
5258 (b) The board shall designate the human trafficking
5359 prevention course required by Subsection (a) as a medical ethics or
5460 professional responsibility course for purposes of complying with
5561 continuing medical education required by Section 156.051(a)(2).
5662 (c) The board shall adopt rules to implement this section.
5763 SECTION 3. Subchapter G, Chapter 301, Occupations Code, is
5864 amended by adding Section 301.308 to read as follows:
5965 Sec. 301.308. CONTINUING EDUCATION IN HUMAN TRAFFICKING
6066 PREVENTION. (a) As part of a continuing competency program under
6167 Section 301.303, a license holder who provides direct patient care
6268 shall complete a human trafficking prevention course approved by
6369 the executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services
6470 Commission under Section 116.002.
6571 (b) The board shall adopt rules to implement this section.
6672 SECTION 4. As soon as practicable after the effective date
6773 of this Act, the executive commissioner of the Health and Human
6874 Services Commission shall approve and post on the commission's
6975 Internet website the list of approved human trafficking prevention
7076 training courses and adopt rules necessary to implement Chapter
7177 116, Occupations Code, as added by this Act.
7278 SECTION 5. (a) As soon as practicable after the effective
7379 date of this Act, the applicable licensing agency shall provide
7480 notice to a health care practitioner of the human trafficking
7581 prevention training required under Chapter 116, Occupations Code,
7682 as added by this Act.
7783 (b) Notwithstanding Section 116.002, Occupations Code, as
7884 added by this Act, a health care practitioner is not required to
7985 comply with that section before September 1, 2020.
8086 SECTION 6. Sections 156.060 and 301.308, Occupations Code,
8187 as added by this Act, apply only to the renewal of a registration
8288 permit to practice medicine or the renewal of a license to practice
8389 nursing on or after September 1, 2020. The renewal of a
8490 registration permit or license before that date is governed by the
8591 law in effect immediately before the effective date of this Act, and
8692 the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
8793 SECTION 7. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
88- ______________________________ ______________________________
89- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
90- I certify that H.B. No. 2059 was passed by the House on May
91- 10, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 134, Nays 7, 2 present, not
92- voting.
93- ______________________________
94- Chief Clerk of the House
95- I certify that H.B. No. 2059 was passed by the Senate on May
96- 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
97- ______________________________
98- Secretary of the Senate
99- APPROVED: _____________________
100- Date
101- _____________________
102- Governor
94+ * * * * *