1 | | - | H.B. No. 2088 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Dean, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 2088 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 7, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health & |
---|
| 4 | + | Human Services; May 20, 2019, reported favorably by the following |
---|
| 5 | + | vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 20, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 11 | | relating to providing information and other resources regarding |
---|
6 | 12 | | safe disposal of Schedule II controlled substance prescription |
---|
7 | 13 | | drugs. |
---|
8 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 15 | | SECTION 1. Section 481.075, Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
10 | 16 | | amended by adding Subsections (n), (o), and (p) to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 17 | | (n) A person dispensing a Schedule II controlled substance |
---|
12 | 18 | | under a prescription shall provide written notice, as defined by |
---|
13 | 19 | | board rule adopted under Subsection (o), on the safe disposal of |
---|
14 | 20 | | controlled substance prescription drugs, unless: |
---|
15 | 21 | | (1) the Schedule II controlled substance prescription |
---|
16 | 22 | | drug is dispensed at a pharmacy or other location that: |
---|
17 | 23 | | (A) is authorized to take back those drugs for |
---|
18 | 24 | | safe disposal; and |
---|
19 | 25 | | (B) regularly accepts those drugs for safe |
---|
20 | 26 | | disposal; or |
---|
21 | 27 | | (2) the dispenser provides to the person to whom the |
---|
22 | 28 | | Schedule II controlled substance prescription drug is dispensed, at |
---|
23 | 29 | | the time of dispensation and at no cost to the person: |
---|
24 | 30 | | (A) a mail-in pouch for surrendering unused |
---|
25 | 31 | | controlled substance prescription drugs; or |
---|
26 | 32 | | (B) chemicals to render any unused drugs unusable |
---|
27 | 33 | | or non-retrievable. |
---|
28 | 34 | | (o) The board shall adopt rules to prescribe the form of the |
---|
29 | 35 | | written notice on the safe disposal of controlled substance |
---|
30 | 36 | | prescription drugs required under Subsection (n). The notice must |
---|
31 | 37 | | include information on locations at which Schedule II controlled |
---|
32 | 38 | | substance prescription drugs are accepted for safe disposal. The |
---|
33 | 39 | | notice, in lieu of listing those locations, may provide the address |
---|
34 | 40 | | of an Internet website specified by the board that provides a |
---|
35 | 41 | | searchable database of locations at which Schedule II controlled |
---|
36 | 42 | | substance prescription drugs are accepted for safe disposal. |
---|
37 | 43 | | (p) The board may take disciplinary action against a person |
---|
38 | 44 | | who fails to comply with Subsection (n). |
---|
39 | 45 | | SECTION 2. Section 481.075(n), Health and Safety Code, as |
---|
40 | 46 | | added by this Act, applies only to a controlled substance |
---|
41 | 47 | | prescription drug dispensed on or after January 1, 2020. |
---|
42 | 48 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
43 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
44 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
45 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2088 was passed by the House on May 3, |
---|
46 | | - | 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 138, Nays 4, 2 present, not |
---|
47 | | - | voting. |
---|
48 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
49 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
50 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2088 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
51 | | - | 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
52 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
53 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
54 | | - | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
55 | | - | Date |
---|
56 | | - | _____________________ |
---|
57 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 49 | + | * * * * * |
---|