House | 04/11/2019 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/11/2019 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/09/2019 | Posting rule suspended | ||
House | 03/13/2019 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 02/19/2019 | Referred to Public Health | ||
House | 02/19/2019 | Read first time | ||
House | 11/12/2018 | Filed |