Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
Record vote RV#800
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Record vote RV#779
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Amendment withdrawn 10-J. González
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered 10-J. González
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Record vote RV#778
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Amendment fails of adoption 9-J. Turner
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Record vote RV#777
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Amendment fails of adoption 8-C. Turner
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Amended 7-Wu
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Amended 6-Wu
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Record vote RV#776
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Amendment fails of adoption 5-Wu
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Record vote RV#775
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Amended 4-Canales
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Amended 3-Leach
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Amended 1-Cain
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Amendment to amendment fails of adoption 2-Wu
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2, and Rule 11, Section 6(e)
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered 1-Cain
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Point of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2019
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|