Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2102 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 2102
1+By: Capriglione, et al. H.B. No. 2102
2+ (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini)
3+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019;
4+ May 6, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
5+ Commerce; May 20, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
6+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0;
7+ May 20, 2019, sent to printer.)
8+Click here to see the committee vote
9+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2102 By: Zaffirini
210
311
12+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
413 AN ACT
514 relating to the payment of insurance deductibles related to
615 property insurance policies; creating a criminal offense.
716 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
817 SECTION 1. Subtitle F, Title 5, Insurance Code, is amended
918 by adding Chapter 707 to read as follows:
1019 CHAPTER 707. PAYMENT OF INSURANCE DEDUCTIBLE
1120 Sec. 707.001. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
1221 (1) "Person" means an individual, corporation,
1322 association, partnership, limited liability company, or other
1423 legal entity.
1524 (2) "Property insurance policy" means an insurance
1625 policy issued by an insurer, including a county mutual insurance
1726 company, farm mutual insurance company, Lloyd's plan, or reciprocal
1827 or interinsurance exchange, that provides first-party coverage for
1928 loss of or damage to real property.
2029 Sec. 707.002. PAYMENT OF DEDUCTIBLE REQUIRED. A person
2130 insured under a property insurance policy shall pay any deductible
2231 applicable to a first-party claim made under the policy.
2332 Sec. 707.003. CONSUMER EDUCATION. The department, in
2433 coordination with other state agencies and stakeholders as
2534 necessary, shall develop and implement an education program related
2635 to the payment of property insurance policy deductibles. The
2736 program must:
2837 (1) provide reasonable methods to educate insurance
2938 consumers and providers of goods or services that are regularly
3039 paid for from proceeds of property insurance claims; and
3140 (2) include information regarding:
3241 (A) the requirements of this chapter and Section
3342 27.02, Business & Commerce Code; and
3443 (B) the conduct prohibited by Section 27.02,
3544 Business & Commerce Code.
3645 Sec. 707.004. REASONABLE PROOF OF PAYMENT. An insurer that
3746 issues a property insurance policy with replacement cost coverage
3847 may refuse to pay a claim for withheld recoverable depreciation or a
3948 replacement cost holdback under the policy until the insurer
4049 receives reasonable proof of payment by the policyholder of any
4150 deductible applicable to the claim. Reasonable proof of payment
4251 includes a canceled check, money order receipt, credit card
4352 statement, or copy of an executed installment plan contract or
4453 other financing arrangement that requires full payment of the
4554 deductible over time.
4655 Sec. 707.005. RULEMAKING. The commissioner may adopt rules
4756 as necessary to implement this chapter. Section 2001.0045,
4857 Government Code, does not apply to rules adopted under this
4958 section.
5059 SECTION 2. Section 27.02, Business & Commerce Code, is
5160 amended to read as follows:
5261 Sec. 27.02. GOODS OR SERVICES PAID FOR BY INSURANCE
5362 PROCEEDS: PAYMENT OF DEDUCTIBLE REQUIRED [CERTAIN INSURANCE CLAIMS
5463 FOR EXCESSIVE CHARGES]. (a) In this section, "property insurance
5564 policy" has the meaning assigned by Section 707.001, Insurance
5665 Code.
5766 (b) A contract to provide a good or service that is
5867 reasonably expected to be paid wholly or partly from the proceeds of
5968 a claim under a property insurance policy and that has a contract
6069 price of $1,000 or more must contain the following notice in at
6170 least 12-point boldfaced type: "Texas law requires a person
6271 insured under a property insurance policy to pay any deductible
6372 applicable to a claim made under the policy. It is a violation of
6473 Texas law for a seller of goods or services who reasonably expects
6574 to be paid wholly or partly from the proceeds of a property
6675 insurance claim to knowingly allow the insured person to fail to
6776 pay, or assist the insured person's failure to pay, the applicable
6877 insurance deductible."
6978 (c) A person who sells goods or services commits an offense
7079 if the person:
7180 (1) advertises or promises to provide a good or
7281 service to an insured under a property insurance policy in a
7382 transaction in which:
7483 (A) the good or service will be paid for by the
7584 insured from the proceeds of a property insurance claim; and
7685 (B) the person selling the good or service will,
7786 without the insurer's consent:
7887 (i) pay, waive, absorb, or otherwise
7988 decline to charge or collect the amount of the insured's
8089 deductible;
8190 (ii) provide a rebate or credit in
8291 connection with the sale of the good or service that will offset all
8392 or part of the amount paid by the insured as a deductible; or
8493 (iii) in any other manner assist the
8594 insured in avoiding monetary payment of the required insurance
8695 deductible; or
8796 (2) provides a good or service to an insured under a
8897 property insurance policy knowing that the insured will pay for the
8998 good or service with the proceeds of a claim under the policy and,
9099 without the insurer's consent:
91100 (A) pays, waives, absorbs, or otherwise declines
92101 to charge or collect the amount of the insured's deductible;
93102 (B) provides a rebate or credit in connection
94103 with the sale of the good or service that offsets all or part of the
95104 amount paid by the insured as a deductible; or
96105 (C) in any other manner assists the insured in
97106 avoiding monetary payment of the required insurance deductible. [A
98107 person who sells goods or services commits an offense if:
99108 [(1) the person advertises or promises to provide the
100109 good or service and to pay:
101110 [(A) all or part of any applicable insurance
102111 deductible; or
103112 [(B) a rebate in an amount equal to all or part of
104113 any applicable insurance deductible;
105114 [(2) the good or service is paid for by the consumer
106115 from proceeds of a property or casualty insurance policy; and
107116 [(3) the person knowingly charges an amount for the
108117 good or service that exceeds the usual and customary charge by the
109118 person for the good or service by an amount equal to or greater than
110119 all or part of the applicable insurance deductible paid by the
111120 person to an insurer on behalf of an insured or remitted to an
112121 insured by the person as a rebate.
113122 [(b) A person who is insured under a property or casualty
114123 insurance policy commits an offense if the person:
115124 [(1) submits a claim under the policy based on charges
116125 that are in violation of Subsection (a) of this section; or
117126 [(2) knowingly allows a claim in violation of
118127 Subsection (a) of this section to be submitted, unless the person
119128 promptly notifies the insurer of the excessive charges.]
120129 (d) [(c)] An offense under this section is a Class B [A]
121130 misdemeanor.
122131 SECTION 3. The changes in law made by this Act to Section
123132 27.02, Business & Commerce Code, apply only to an offense committed
124133 on or after the effective date of this Act. An offense committed
125134 before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in
126135 effect on the date the offense was committed, and the former law is
127136 continued in effect for that purpose. For purposes of this section,
128137 an offense was committed before the effective date of this Act if
129138 any element of the offense occurred before that date.
130139 SECTION 4. Section 27.02(b), Business & Commerce Code, as
131140 amended by this Act, applies only to a contract entered into on or
132141 after the effective date of this Act.
133142 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
134- ______________________________ ______________________________
135- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
136- I certify that H.B. No. 2102 was passed by the House on May 3,
137- 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 136, Nays 4, 2 present, not
138- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
139- No. 2102 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 82, Nays 50,
140- 2 present, not voting.
141- ______________________________
142- Chief Clerk of the House
143- I certify that H.B. No. 2102 was passed by the Senate, with
144- amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
145- 0.
146- ______________________________
147- Secretary of the Senate
148- APPROVED: __________________
149- Date
150- __________________
151- Governor
143+ * * * * *