Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2103 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/21/2019

                    By: Capriglione, Bonnen of Galveston H.B. No. 2103
 (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2019;
 April 16, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business & Commerce; May 20, 2019, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; May 20, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2103 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a prohibition on contractors acting as public insurance
 adjusters in certain circumstances.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Section 4102.163, Insurance Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 4102.163.  CERTAIN CONTRACTOR [ROOFING-RELATED]
 BUSINESS PROHIBITED.
 SECTION 2.  Section 4102.163(a), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  A [roofing] contractor may not act as a public adjuster
 or advertise to adjust claims for any property for which the
 contractor is providing or may provide contracting [roofing]
 services, regardless of whether the contractor:
 (1)  holds a license under this chapter; or
 (2)  is authorized to act on behalf of the insured under
 a power of attorney or other agreement.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *