1 | | - | H.B. No. 2103 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Capriglione, Bonnen of Galveston H.B. No. 2103 |
---|
| 2 | + | (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) |
---|
| 3 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2019; |
---|
| 4 | + | April 16, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 5 | + | Business & Commerce; May 20, 2019, reported adversely, with |
---|
| 6 | + | favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, |
---|
| 7 | + | Nays 0; May 20, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 8 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 9 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2103 By: Zaffirini |
---|
4 | 13 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 14 | | relating to a prohibition on contractors acting as public insurance |
---|
6 | 15 | | adjusters in certain circumstances. |
---|
7 | 16 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 17 | | SECTION 1. The heading to Section 4102.163, Insurance Code, |
---|
9 | 18 | | is amended to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 19 | | Sec. 4102.163. CERTAIN CONTRACTOR [ROOFING-RELATED] |
---|
11 | 20 | | BUSINESS PROHIBITED. |
---|
12 | 21 | | SECTION 2. Section 4102.163(a), Insurance Code, is amended |
---|
13 | 22 | | to read as follows: |
---|
14 | 23 | | (a) A [roofing] contractor may not act as a public adjuster |
---|
15 | 24 | | or advertise to adjust claims for any property for which the |
---|
16 | 25 | | contractor is providing or may provide contracting [roofing] |
---|
17 | 26 | | services, regardless of whether the contractor: |
---|
18 | 27 | | (1) holds a license under this chapter; or |
---|
19 | 28 | | (2) is authorized to act on behalf of the insured under |
---|
20 | 29 | | a power of attorney or other agreement. |
---|
21 | 30 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
22 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
23 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
24 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2103 was passed by the House on April |
---|
25 | | - | 12, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 1, 2 present, not |
---|
26 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
27 | | - | No. 2103 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 138, Nays 4, |
---|
28 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
29 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
30 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
31 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2103 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
32 | | - | amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
33 | | - | 0. |
---|
34 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
35 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
36 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
37 | | - | Date |
---|
38 | | - | __________________ |
---|
39 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 31 | + | * * * * * |
---|