Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2107 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 2107
1+By: Capriglione, et al. H.B. No. 2107
2+ (Senate Sponsor - Hughes)
3+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 15, 2019;
4+ April 17, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
5+ Human Services; May 8, 2019, reported favorably by the following
6+ vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 8, 2019, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
28
39
10+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
411 AN ACT
512 relating to information provided by a local health jurisdiction on
613 food regulation.
714 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
815 SECTION 1. The heading to Subchapter H, Chapter 438, Health
916 and Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
1017 SUBCHAPTER H. INFORMATION ON DEPARTMENT OR LOCAL HEALTH
1118 JURISDICTION FOOD REGULATION
1219 SECTION 2. Subchapter H, Chapter 438, Health and Safety
1320 Code, is amended by adding Section 438.151 to read as follows:
1421 Sec. 438.151. DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "local
1522 health jurisdiction" means a public health district, county, or
1623 municipality that regulates food service establishments, retail
1724 food stores, mobile food units, temporary food service
1825 establishments, or roadside food vendors.
1926 SECTION 3. Section 438.152, Health and Safety Code, is
2027 amended to read as follows:
2128 Sec. 438.152. REQUEST FOR INFORMATION. Unless otherwise
2229 prohibited by state or federal law, on receipt of a written request
2330 for information pertaining to the regulation of food under this
2431 subtitle, the department or a local health jurisdiction shall
2532 provide a reasonable and substantial response to the request not
2633 later than the 30th day after the date the department or local
2734 health jurisdiction receives the request.
2835 SECTION 4. Section 438.153, Health and Safety Code, is
2936 amended to read as follows:
3037 Sec. 438.153. REQUEST FOR OFFICIAL DETERMINATION. (a) On
3138 receipt of a written request regarding the applicability to a
3239 specific circumstance of a regulation or the requirements for
3340 compliance with the regulation, the department or local health
3441 jurisdiction shall provide an official written determination
3542 regarding the applicability of the regulation or the requirements
3643 for compliance with the regulation to the requestor not later than
3744 the 30th day after the date the department or local health
3845 jurisdiction receives the request.
3946 (b) An official determination made under this section is
4047 valid until the regulation that is the subject of the determination
4148 is amended by statute, [or] department rule, or local health
4249 jurisdiction regulation.
4350 SECTION 5. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
4451 a request for information or official determination made under
4552 Subchapter H, Chapter 438, Health and Safety Code, as amended by
4653 this Act, to a local health jurisdiction on or after January 1,
4754 2020. A request for information or official determination made to a
4855 local health jurisdiction before January 1, 2020, is governed by
4956 the law in effect immediately before the effective date of this Act,
5057 and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
5158 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
52- ______________________________ ______________________________
53- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
54- I certify that H.B. No. 2107 was passed by the House on April
55- 12, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 0, 2 present, not
56- voting.
57- ______________________________
58- Chief Clerk of the House
59- I certify that H.B. No. 2107 was passed by the Senate on May
60- 15, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
61- ______________________________
62- Secretary of the Senate
63- APPROVED: _____________________
64- Date
65- _____________________
66- Governor
59+ * * * * *