|
06/15/2019
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
05/24/2019
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2019
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2019
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2019
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Referred to Property Tax
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2019
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2019
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2019
|
Record vote RV#707
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2019
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2019
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|