Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2119 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 2119
1+By: Cortez (Senate Sponsor - Campbell) H.B. No. 2119
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2019;
3+ April 30, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Veteran Affairs & Border Security; May 10, 2019, reported
5+ favorably by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 10, 2019, sent
6+ to printer.)
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to the application for and loans from the Texas military
612 value revolving loan account.
713 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
814 SECTION 1. Section 436.054, Government Code, is amended by
9- amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsections (c), (d), and (e) to
10- read as follows:
15+ amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (c) to read as
16+ follows:
1117 (b) The commission is a governmental body for purposes of
1218 the open meetings law, Chapter 551. Except as otherwise provided by
13- this section, Chapter 551 applies to a meeting of the commission.
19+ Subsection (c), Chapter 551 applies to a meeting of the commission.
1420 (c) The commission may allow for members' participation in a
1521 meeting by telephone or other means of telecommunication or
1622 electronic communication to consider an application for a loan from
1723 the Texas military value revolving loan account. Any voting
1824 conducted by telephone or other means of telecommunication or
1925 electronic communication shall be subject to the same quorum
2026 requirements of meetings where members are present in person.
21- (d) A meeting described by Subsection (c) is subject to the
22- notice requirements applicable to other meetings. The notice of
23- the meeting must specify as the location of the meeting the location
24- where meetings of the commission are usually held.
25- (e) Each part of a meeting described by Subsection (c) that
26- is required to be open to the public shall be audible to the public
27- at the location specified in the notice of the meeting as the
28- location of the meeting and the audio shall be recorded. The audio
29- recording shall be made available to the public.
3027 SECTION 2. Subchapter D, Chapter 436, Government Code, is
3128 amended by adding Section 436.1533 to read as follows:
3229 Sec. 436.1533. USE OF LOAN PROCEEDS TO PAY OTHER DEBT
3330 INCURRED TO FINANCE PROJECT. A defense community awarded a loan of
3431 financial assistance from the Texas military value revolving loan
3532 account for an eligible project under this subchapter may use a
3633 portion of the loan proceeds to pay off other debt, including
3734 commercial debt, the defense community incurred for purposes of
3835 financing the project.
3936 SECTION 3. Section 436.154(a), Government Code, is amended
4037 to read as follows:
4138 (a) The commission shall adopt rules, in consultation with
4239 the Texas Public Finance Authority, that contain the criteria for
4340 evaluating the credit of a loan applicant and the financial
4441 feasibility of a project. The commission, in consultation with the
4542 Texas Public Finance Authority, shall also adopt a loan application
4643 form. The application form may include:
4744 (1) the name of the defense community and its
4845 principal officers;
4946 (2) the total cost of the project;
5047 (3) the amount of state financial assistance
5148 requested;
5249 (4) the plan for repaying the loan; and
5350 (5) any other information the commission requires to
5451 perform its duties and to protect the public interest.
5552 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
56- ______________________________ ______________________________
57- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
58- I certify that H.B. No. 2119 was passed by the House on April
59- 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 147, Nays 0, 1 present, not
60- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
61- No. 2119 on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0,
62- 1 present, not voting.
63- ______________________________
64- Chief Clerk of the House
65- I certify that H.B. No. 2119 was passed by the Senate, with
66- amendments, on May 14, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
67- 0.
68- ______________________________
69- Secretary of the Senate
70- APPROVED: __________________
71- Date
72- __________________
73- Governor
53+ * * * * *