1 | | - | H.B. No. 2140 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Neave, Button (Senate Sponsor - Powell) H.B. No. 2140 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher |
---|
| 4 | + | Education; May 19, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
| 5 | + | Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 11 | | relating to creating an electronic application system for state |
---|
6 | 12 | | student financial assistance. |
---|
7 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, is |
---|
9 | 15 | | amended by adding Section 61.07762 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 16 | | Sec. 61.07762. APPLICATION FOR STATE FINANCIAL AID. (a) |
---|
11 | 17 | | The board shall adopt procedures to allow a person to complete and |
---|
12 | 18 | | submit the Texas Application for State Financial Aid (TASFA) or a |
---|
13 | 19 | | similar application for state student financial assistance by |
---|
14 | 20 | | electronic submission through the Internet website through which |
---|
15 | 21 | | the board provides the common admission application form required |
---|
16 | 22 | | by Section 51.762. |
---|
17 | 23 | | (a-1) The board shall appoint an advisory committee |
---|
18 | 24 | | composed of financial aid personnel at institutions of higher |
---|
19 | 25 | | education and stakeholders who represent the needs of interested |
---|
20 | 26 | | students to assist the board in adopting the procedures required by |
---|
21 | 27 | | Subsection (a) and to develop recommendations for that purpose. |
---|
22 | 28 | | Not later than January 1, 2021, the board shall report the advisory |
---|
23 | 29 | | committee's recommendations to the standing committee of each house |
---|
24 | 30 | | of the legislature with jurisdiction over higher education. This |
---|
25 | 31 | | subsection expires January 1, 2023. |
---|
26 | 32 | | (b) For the purposes of this section, the board shall |
---|
27 | 33 | | continuously maintain an online database of institutions of higher |
---|
28 | 34 | | education to which state student financial assistance may be |
---|
29 | 35 | | applied. |
---|
30 | 36 | | (c) The personal information of an individual maintained by |
---|
31 | 37 | | the board for the purposes of this section is confidential and is |
---|
32 | 38 | | not subject to disclosure under Chapter 552, Government Code. |
---|
33 | 39 | | (d) The board may adopt rules as necessary to implement this |
---|
34 | 40 | | section. |
---|
35 | 41 | | SECTION 2. The changes in law made by this Act apply |
---|
36 | 42 | | beginning with applications for state student financial assistance |
---|
37 | 43 | | submitted for the 2022-2023 academic year. |
---|
38 | 44 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
39 | 45 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
40 | 46 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
41 | 47 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
42 | 48 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
43 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
44 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
45 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2140 was passed by the House on April |
---|
46 | | - | 25, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 130, Nays 4, 2 present, not |
---|
47 | | - | voting. |
---|
48 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
49 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
50 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2140 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
51 | | - | 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
52 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
53 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
54 | | - | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
55 | | - | Date |
---|
56 | | - | _____________________ |
---|
57 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 49 | + | * * * * * |
---|