Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2143 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 05/27/2019

                            H.B. No. 2143


 AN ACT
 relating to the eligibility of a first responder for workers'
 compensation benefits for post-traumatic stress disorder.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 504.019, Labor Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (c) to read as
 follows:
 (b)  Post-traumatic stress disorder suffered by a first
 responder is a compensable injury under this subtitle only if it is
 based on a diagnosis that:
 (1)  the disorder is caused by one or more events [an
 event] occurring in the course and scope of the first responder's
 employment; and
 (2)  the preponderance of the evidence indicates that
 the event or events were [was] a producing cause [substantial
 contributing factor] of the disorder.
 (c)  For purposes of this subtitle, the date of injury for
 post-traumatic stress disorder suffered by a first responder is the
 date on which the first responder first knew or should have known
 that the disorder may be related to the first responder's
 employment.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a claim for workers' compensation benefits based on a
 compensable injury that occurs on or after the effective date of
 this Act. A claim based on a compensable injury that occurs before
 that date is governed by the law as it existed on the date the
 compensable injury occurred, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2143 was passed by the House on May
 10, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 129, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 2143 on May 24, 2019, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 2143 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 144,
 Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2143 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 2143 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor