Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2153 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 5, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill April 25, 2019
Bill March 25, 2019