House
|
05/10/2019
|
Point of order sustained Article III, Section 30, and Article III, Section 35
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2019
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Amended 1-Landgraf
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2019
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2019
|
Committee substitute considered in s/c
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2019
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2019
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2019
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2019
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|