4 | 13 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 14 | | relating to a grant program to reduce wait times for agricultural |
---|
6 | 15 | | inspections of vehicles at ports of entry along the Texas-Mexico |
---|
7 | 16 | | border. |
---|
8 | 17 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 18 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 12, Agriculture Code, is amended by |
---|
10 | 19 | | adding Section 12.050 to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 20 | | Sec. 12.050. TRADE AGRICULTURAL INSPECTION GRANT PROGRAM. |
---|
12 | 21 | | (a) Using money appropriated for this purpose or money received |
---|
13 | 22 | | under Subsection (g), the department may make a grant to a nonprofit |
---|
14 | 23 | | organization for the purpose of promoting the agricultural |
---|
15 | 24 | | processing industry in this state by reducing wait times for |
---|
16 | 25 | | agricultural inspections of vehicles at ports of entry along the |
---|
17 | 26 | | border with the United Mexican States. |
---|
18 | 27 | | (b) The department shall request proposals for the award of |
---|
19 | 28 | | a grant under this section. The department shall evaluate the |
---|
20 | 29 | | proposals and award a grant based on the proposed program's |
---|
21 | 30 | | quantifiable effectiveness and the potentially positive impact on |
---|
22 | 31 | | the agricultural processing industry in this state. |
---|
23 | 32 | | (c) A grant awarded under this section must be made to an |
---|
24 | 33 | | organization that has demonstrated experience working with border |
---|
25 | 34 | | inspection authorities to reduce border crossing wait times. |
---|
26 | 35 | | (d) A grant recipient may use grant money received under |
---|
27 | 36 | | this section only to pay for activities directly related to the |
---|
28 | 37 | | purpose of the grant program as described by Subsection (a). A |
---|
29 | 38 | | grant recipient may use grant money to reimburse a federal |
---|
30 | 39 | | governmental agency that, at the request of the grant recipient, |
---|
31 | 40 | | provides additional border agricultural inspectors or pays |
---|
32 | 41 | | overtime to border agricultural inspectors at ports of entry along |
---|
33 | 42 | | the border with the United Mexican States. |
---|
34 | 43 | | (e) The department shall establish procedures to administer |
---|
35 | 44 | | the grant program, including a procedure for the submission of a |
---|
36 | 45 | | proposal and a procedure to be used by the department to evaluate a |
---|
37 | 46 | | proposal. |
---|
38 | 47 | | (f) The department shall enter into a contract that includes |
---|
39 | 48 | | performance requirements with each grant recipient. The department |
---|
40 | 49 | | shall monitor and enforce the terms of the contract. The contract |
---|
41 | 50 | | must authorize the department to recoup grant money from a grant |
---|
42 | 51 | | recipient for failure of the grant recipient to comply with the |
---|
43 | 52 | | terms of the contract. |
---|
44 | 53 | | (g) The department may solicit and accept gifts, grants, and |
---|
45 | 54 | | donations from any source for the purpose of awarding grants under |
---|
46 | 55 | | this section. |
---|
47 | 56 | | (h) To be eligible to receive a grant under this section, a |
---|
48 | 57 | | nonprofit organization must provide matching funds. The department |
---|
49 | 58 | | may not award a grant to a nonprofit organization until the |
---|
50 | 59 | | department certifies that the nonprofit organization has the |
---|
51 | 60 | | matching funds. The amount of the grant may not exceed the amount |
---|
52 | 61 | | of matching funds. The department may not require a nonprofit |
---|
53 | 62 | | organization to provide matching funds in an amount that exceeds |
---|
54 | 63 | | the amount of the grant. |
---|
55 | 64 | | (i) The total amount of grants awarded under this section |
---|
56 | 65 | | may not exceed $725,000 for the duration of the program. |
---|
57 | 66 | | (j) The department may adopt any rules necessary to |
---|
58 | 67 | | implement this section. |
---|
59 | 68 | | (k) Not later than January 15, 2021, the department shall |
---|
60 | 69 | | evaluate the performance of the program under this section and |
---|
61 | 70 | | submit a report to the legislature. The report must include an |
---|
62 | 71 | | evaluation of agricultural inspections affected by the program, |
---|
63 | 72 | | including the extent to which the program is reducing wait times for |
---|
64 | 73 | | agricultural inspections of vehicles at ports of entry along the |
---|
65 | 74 | | border with the United Mexican States. |
---|
66 | 75 | | (l) Unless continued in existence by the legislature, this |
---|
67 | 76 | | section expires September 1, 2021. |
---|
68 | 77 | | SECTION 2. The Department of Agriculture is required to |
---|
69 | 78 | | implement a provision of this Act only if the legislature |
---|
70 | 79 | | appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If the |
---|
71 | 80 | | legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that |
---|
72 | 81 | | purpose, the department may, but is not required to, implement a |
---|
73 | 82 | | provision of this Act using other appropriations available for that |
---|
74 | 83 | | purpose. |
---|
75 | 84 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
76 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
77 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
78 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2155 was passed by the House on May 9, |
---|
79 | | - | 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 95, Nays 39, 4 present, not |
---|
80 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
81 | | - | No. 2155 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 107, Nays 35, |
---|
82 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
83 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
84 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
85 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2155 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
86 | | - | amendments, on May 21, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 19, Nays |
---|
87 | | - | 12. |
---|
88 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
89 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
90 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
91 | | - | Date |
---|
92 | | - | __________________ |
---|
93 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 85 | + | * * * * * |
---|