1 | | - | H.B. No. 2164 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Burns, Holland (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 2164 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 1, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State |
---|
| 4 | + | Affairs; May 13, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 1; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 13, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2164 By: Hughes |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to imposing a civil penalty for prohibiting or otherwise |
---|
6 | 14 | | restricting a peace officer or special investigator from carrying a |
---|
7 | 15 | | weapon on certain premises open to the public. |
---|
8 | 16 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 17 | | SECTION 1. Article 2.1305, Code of Criminal Procedure, is |
---|
10 | 18 | | amended by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 19 | | (c) An establishment serving the public that violates this |
---|
12 | 20 | | article is subject to a civil penalty in the amount of $1,000 for |
---|
13 | 21 | | each violation. The attorney general may sue to collect a civil |
---|
14 | 22 | | penalty under this subsection. Money collected under this |
---|
15 | 23 | | subsection shall be deposited in the state treasury to the credit of |
---|
16 | 24 | | the general revenue fund. |
---|
17 | 25 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
18 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
19 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
20 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2164 was passed by the House on April |
---|
21 | | - | 25, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 131, Nays 3, 1 present, not |
---|
22 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
23 | | - | No. 2164 on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 139, Nays 4, |
---|
24 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
25 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
26 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
27 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2164 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
28 | | - | amendments, on May 16, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays |
---|
29 | | - | 2. |
---|
30 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
31 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
32 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
33 | | - | Date |
---|
34 | | - | __________________ |
---|
35 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 26 | + | * * * * * |
---|