Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2188 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 2188
1+By: Frullo, Larson H.B. No. 2188
2+ (Senate Sponsor - Alvarado, Taylor)
3+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 30, 2019;
4+ May 3, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
5+ Transportation; May 13, 2019, reported favorably by the following
6+ vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 13, 2019, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
28
39
10+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
411 AN ACT
512 relating to the operation of electric and nonelectric bicycles.
613 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
714 SECTION 1. Section 502.143, Transportation Code, is amended
815 to read as follows:
916 Sec. 502.143. OTHER VEHICLES. An owner may not register the
1017 following vehicles for operation on a public highway:
1118 (1) power sweepers;
1219 (2) motorized mobility devices;
1320 (3) electric personal assistive mobility devices; and
1421 (4) electric bicycles, as defined by Section 664.001.
1522 SECTION 2. Sections 541.201(2) and (24), Transportation
1623 Code, are amended to read as follows:
1724 (2) "Bicycle" means a device that a person may ride and
1825 that:
1926 (A) is capable of being ridden solely using
2027 [propelled by] human power; and
2128 (B) has two tandem wheels at least one of which is
2229 more than 14 inches in diameter.
2330 (24) "Electric bicycle" has the meaning assigned by
2431 Section 664.001 [means a bicycle that:
2532 [(A) is designed to be propelled by an electric
2633 motor, exclusively or in combination with the application of human
2734 power;
2835 [(B) cannot attain a speed of more than 20 miles
2936 per hour without the application of human power; and
3037 [(C) does not exceed a weight of 100 pounds].
3138 SECTION 3. Section 551.001, Transportation Code, is amended
3239 to read as follows:
3340 Sec. 551.001. APPLICABILITY [PERSONS AFFECTED]. Unless
3441 specifically provided otherwise, a provision of [Except as provided
3542 by Subchapter C,] this chapter that applies to a person operating a
3643 bicycle applies only to a person operating a bicycle on:
3744 (1) a highway; or
3845 (2) a path set aside for the exclusive operation of
3946 bicycles.
4047 SECTION 4. The heading to Subchapter B, Chapter 551,
4148 Transportation Code, is amended to read as follows:
4249 SUBCHAPTER B. BICYCLES [REGULATION OF OPERATION]
4350 SECTION 5. Section 551.106, Transportation Code, is amended
4451 to read as follows:
4552 Sec. 551.106. REGULATION OF [ELECTRIC] BICYCLES BY
4653 DEPARTMENT OR LOCAL AUTHORITY. (a) The department or a local
4754 authority may not prohibit the operation [use] of an electric
4855 bicycle:
4956 (1) on a highway that is used primarily by motor
5057 vehicles; or
5158 (2) in an area in which the operation of a nonelectric
5259 bicycle is permitted, unless the area is a path that:
5360 (A) is not open to motor vehicles; and
5461 (B) has a natural surface tread made by clearing
5562 and grading the native soil without adding surfacing materials.
5663 (b) The department or a local authority may:
5764 (1) prohibit the operation of a [use of an electric]
5865 bicycle on a sidewalk; and
5966 (2) establish speed limits for bicycles on paths set
6067 aside for the exclusive operation of bicycles and other paths on
6168 which bicycles may be operated [highway used primarily by
6269 pedestrians].
6370 (c) [(b)] The department may [shall] establish rules for
6471 the administration of this section if necessary.
6572 SECTION 6. Subchapter B, Chapter 551, Transportation Code,
6673 is amended by adding Section 551.107 to read as follows:
6774 Sec. 551.107. OPERATION OF ELECTRIC BICYCLE. (a)
6875 Subtitles A, B, and D and Chapter 663 do not apply to the operation
6976 of an electric bicycle.
7077 (b) A person may not operate an electric bicycle unless the
7178 electric motor disengages or ceases to function either:
7279 (1) when the operator stops pedaling; or
7380 (2) when the brakes are applied.
7481 (c) A person may not operate a Class 3 electric bicycle, as
7582 defined by Section 664.001, unless the person is at least 15 years
7683 of age. This subsection does not prohibit a person who is under 15
7784 years of age from riding on a Class 3 bicycle as a passenger.
7885 SECTION 7. The heading to Subtitle G, Title 7,
7986 Transportation Code, is amended to read as follows:
8087 SUBTITLE G. MOTORCYCLES, [AND] OFF-HIGHWAY VEHICLES, AND ELECTRIC
8188 BICYCLES
8289 SECTION 8. Subtitle G, Title 7, Transportation Code, is
8390 amended by adding Chapter 664 to read as follows:
8491 CHAPTER 664. STANDARDS FOR ELECTRIC BICYCLES
8592 Sec. 664.001. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
8693 (1) "Class 1 electric bicycle" means an electric
8794 bicycle:
8895 (A) equipped with a motor that assists the rider
8996 only when the rider is pedaling; and
9097 (B) with a top assisted speed of 20 miles per hour
9198 or less.
9299 (2) "Class 2 electric bicycle" means an electric
93100 bicycle:
94101 (A) equipped with a motor that may be used to
95102 propel the bicycle without the pedaling of the rider; and
96103 (B) with a top assisted speed of 20 miles per hour
97104 or less.
98105 (3) "Class 3 electric bicycle" means an electric
99106 bicycle:
100107 (A) equipped with a motor that assists the rider
101108 only when the rider is pedaling; and
102109 (B) with a top assisted speed of more than 20 but
103110 less than 28 miles per hour.
104111 (4) "Electric bicycle" means a bicycle:
105112 (A) equipped with:
106113 (i) fully operable pedals; and
107114 (ii) an electric motor of fewer than 750
108115 watts; and
109116 (B) with a top assisted speed of 28 miles per hour
110117 or less.
111118 (5) "Top assisted speed" means the speed at which the
112119 bicycle's motor ceases propelling the bicycle or assisting the
113120 rider.
114121 Sec. 664.002. LABELING. (a) A person who manufactures or
115122 sells an electric bicycle shall apply a permanent label to the
116123 electric bicycle in a prominent location that shows in Arial font in
117124 at least 9-point type:
118125 (1) whether the electric bicycle is a Class 1, Class 2,
119126 or Class 3 electric bicycle;
120127 (2) the top assisted speed of the electric bicycle;
121128 and
122129 (3) the motor wattage of the electric bicycle.
123130 (b) A person who changes the motor-powered speed capability
124131 or engagement of an electric bicycle shall replace the label
125132 required by Subsection (a) to show accurate information about the
126133 electric bicycle.
127134 Sec. 664.003. FEDERAL STANDARDS. A person who manufactures
128135 or sells an electric bicycle shall ensure that the bicycle complies
129136 with the equipment and manufacturing requirements for bicycles
130137 adopted by the United States Consumer Product Safety Commission
131138 under 16 C.F.R. Part 1512.
132139 Sec. 664.004. SPEEDOMETER. A person who manufactures or
133140 sells a Class 3 electric bicycle shall ensure that the bicycle is
134141 equipped with a speedometer.
135142 SECTION 9. Chapter 664, Transportation Code, as added by
136143 this Act, applies only to an electric bicycle manufactured or sold
137144 on or after January 1, 2020.
138145 SECTION 10. Sections 501.002(7) and 502.001(12),
139146 Transportation Code, are repealed.
140147 SECTION 11. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
141- ______________________________ ______________________________
142- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
143- I certify that H.B. No. 2188 was passed by the House on April
144- 30, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 2, 1 present, not
145- voting.
146- ______________________________
147- Chief Clerk of the House
148- I certify that H.B. No. 2188 was passed by the Senate on May
149- 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 29, Nays 2.
150- ______________________________
151- Secretary of the Senate
152- APPROVED: _____________________
153- Date
154- _____________________
155- Governor
148+ * * * * *