1 | | - | H.B. No. 2199 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: King of Uvalde (Senate Sponsor - Flores, Lucio) H.B. No. 2199 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 7, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural |
---|
| 4 | + | Resources & Economic Development; May 17, 2019, reported |
---|
| 5 | + | adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following |
---|
| 6 | + | vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 17, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2199 By: RodrÃguez |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy tax revenue in |
---|
6 | 14 | | certain municipalities. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Section 351.1066(a), Tax Code, is amended to |
---|
9 | 17 | | read as follows: |
---|
10 | 18 | | (a) This section applies only to: |
---|
11 | 19 | | (1) a municipality with a population of at least 3,500 |
---|
12 | 20 | | but less than 5,500 that is the county seat of a county with a |
---|
13 | 21 | | population of less than 50,000 that borders a county with a |
---|
14 | 22 | | population of more than 1.6 million; |
---|
15 | 23 | | (2) a municipality with a population of at least 2,900 |
---|
16 | 24 | | but less than 3,500 that is the county seat of a county with a |
---|
17 | 25 | | population of less than 22,000 that is bordered by the Trinity River |
---|
18 | 26 | | and includes a state park and a portion of a wildlife management |
---|
19 | 27 | | area; |
---|
20 | 28 | | (3) a municipality with a population of at least 7,500 |
---|
21 | 29 | | that is located in a county that borders the Pecos River and that |
---|
22 | 30 | | has a population of not more than 15,000; |
---|
23 | 31 | | (4) a municipality with a population of not more than |
---|
24 | 32 | | 5,000 that is located in a county through which the Frio River flows |
---|
25 | 33 | | and an interstate highway crosses, and that has a population of at |
---|
26 | 34 | | least 15,000; [and] |
---|
27 | 35 | | (5) a municipality with a population of not less than |
---|
28 | 36 | | 7,500 that is located in a county with a population of not less than |
---|
29 | 37 | | 40,000 but less than 250,000 that is adjacent to a county with a |
---|
30 | 38 | | population of less than 750; |
---|
31 | 39 | | (6) a municipality that is the county seat of a county |
---|
32 | 40 | | with a population of at least 8,500 and that county contains part of |
---|
33 | 41 | | the Chaparral Wildlife Management Area; and |
---|
34 | 42 | | (7) a municipality that has a population of not more |
---|
35 | 43 | | than 25,000, that contains a cultural heritage museum, and that is |
---|
36 | 44 | | located in a county that borders the United Mexican States and the |
---|
37 | 45 | | Gulf of Mexico. |
---|
38 | 46 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
39 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
40 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
41 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2199 was passed by the House on May 3, |
---|
42 | | - | 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 108, Nays 32, 2 present, not |
---|
43 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
44 | | - | No. 2199 on May 23, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 117, Nays 26, |
---|
45 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
46 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
47 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
48 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2199 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
49 | | - | amendments, on May 20, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 25, Nays |
---|
50 | | - | 6. |
---|
51 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
52 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
53 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
54 | | - | Date |
---|
55 | | - | __________________ |
---|
56 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 47 | + | * * * * * |
---|