Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2203 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 15, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 9, 2019
Bill April 11, 2019