1 | | - | H.B. No. 2214 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Hernandez (Senate Sponsor - Taylor) H.B. No. 2214 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 7, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran |
---|
| 4 | + | Affairs & Border Security; May 17, 2019, reported favorably by the |
---|
| 5 | + | following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 17, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 11 | | relating to a report by the Texas Department of Licensing and |
---|
6 | 12 | | Regulation concerning license applicants who are military service |
---|
7 | 13 | | members, military veterans, or military spouses. |
---|
8 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 15 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter H, Chapter 51, Occupations Code, is |
---|
10 | 16 | | amended by adding Section 51.40135 to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 17 | | Sec. 51.40135. REPORT CONCERNING LICENSE APPLICANTS WHO ARE |
---|
12 | 18 | | MILITARY SERVICE MEMBERS, MILITARY VETERANS, OR MILITARY SPOUSES. |
---|
13 | 19 | | (a) In this section, "military service member," "military |
---|
14 | 20 | | veteran," and "military spouse" have the meanings assigned by |
---|
15 | 21 | | Section 55.001. |
---|
16 | 22 | | (b) The department shall review each type of license issued |
---|
17 | 23 | | by the department to an individual to identify the types for which a |
---|
18 | 24 | | significant number of military service members, military veterans, |
---|
19 | 25 | | or military spouses submit applications. |
---|
20 | 26 | | (c) Not later than December 1, 2020, the department shall |
---|
21 | 27 | | submit to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the |
---|
22 | 28 | | house of representatives, and each legislative standing committee |
---|
23 | 29 | | with primary jurisdiction over the department a report on the |
---|
24 | 30 | | results of the review and any recommendations related to the |
---|
25 | 31 | | efficient issuance of licenses to qualified military service |
---|
26 | 32 | | members, military veterans, and military spouses. |
---|
27 | 33 | | (d) The department shall make the report available on the |
---|
28 | 34 | | department's Internet website. |
---|
29 | 35 | | (e) This section expires September 1, 2021. |
---|
30 | 36 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
31 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
32 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
33 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2214 was passed by the House on April |
---|
34 | | - | 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 135, Nays 4, 2 present, not |
---|
35 | | - | voting. |
---|
36 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
37 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
38 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2214 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
39 | | - | 20, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
40 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
41 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
42 | | - | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
43 | | - | Date |
---|
44 | | - | _____________________ |
---|
45 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 37 | + | * * * * * |
---|