By: Geren, Cain (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 2228 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 16, 2019; April 17, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce; May 2, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 2, 2019, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the inspection of certain boilers. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 755.026, Health and Safety Code, is amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (c-1) to read as follows: (a) With the approval of the executive director and the inspection agency that has jurisdiction for the power boiler, the interval between internal inspections may be extended to a period not exceeding a total of 60 months. For unfired steam boilers or steam collection or liberation drums of process steam generators, the inspection interval may be extended to the next scheduled downtime of the boiler, but not exceeding a total of: (1) 84 months for unfired steam boilers; [or] (2) 120 months for steam collection or liberation drums of process steam generators manufactured before January 1, 1970; or (3) 144 months for steam collection or liberation drums of process steam generators manufactured on or after January 1, 1970. (c-1) The executive director and the inspection agency on request may grant an extension for a period not to exceed 24 months in addition to the extension authorized under Subsection (a)(2). The request must include a report issued by an engineer licensed by the Texas Board of Professional Engineers certifying: (1) completion in accordance with industry standards of a quantitative engineering assessment for in-service equipment, repairs, and alterations prescribed by the National Board Inspection Code NB23; and (2) based on the assessment, the steam collection or liberation drums of the process steam generator are safe to operate. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. * * * * *