House
|
05/03/2019
|
Laid on the table subject to call
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2019
|
Companion considered in lieu of SB 1598
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2019
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2019
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2019
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2019
|
Withdrawn from calendar (by author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2019
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2019
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2019
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2019
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2019
|
Filed
|
|
|