Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2263 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 2263
1+By: Paddie, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 2263
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019;
3+ April 15, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Business & Commerce; April 30, 2019, reported favorably by the
5+ following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 30, 2019, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to the sale of electric power to certain public customers.
612 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
713 SECTION 1. Section 52.133(d), Natural Resources Code, is
814 amended to read as follows:
915 (d) The commissioner, the owner of the soil under Subchapter
1016 F, or the commissioner acting on behalf of and at the direction of
1117 an owner of the soil under Subchapter F, the board, or a board for
1218 lease may negotiate and execute contracts or any other instruments
1319 or agreements necessary to convert that portion of the royalty
1420 taken in kind into other forms of energy, other than [including]
1521 electricity.
1622 SECTION 2. Section 53.026(b), Natural Resources Code, is
1723 amended to read as follows:
1824 (b) The commissioner or the commissioner acting on behalf of
1925 and at the direction of the board or a board for lease may negotiate
2026 and execute a contract or any other instrument or agreement
2127 necessary to convert that portion of the royalty taken in kind to
2228 other forms of energy, other than [including] electricity.
2329 SECTION 3. Section 53.077(b), Natural Resources Code, is
2430 amended to read as follows:
2531 (b) The commissioner, each owner of the soil under this
2632 subchapter, or the commissioner acting on behalf of and at the
2733 direction of the owner of the soil under this subchapter may
2834 negotiate and execute a contract or any other instrument or
2935 agreement necessary to convert that portion of the royalty taken in
3036 kind to other forms of energy, other than [including] electricity.
3137 SECTION 4. Section 182.022, Tax Code, is amended by adding
3238 Subsection (d) to read as follows:
3339 (d) Notwithstanding any other provisions of this chapter, a
3440 tax under this chapter may not be imposed on the gross receipts from
3541 the sale of electricity to a public school district customer.
3642 SECTION 5. Section 35.102, Utilities Code, is transferred
3743 to Subchapter A, Chapter 101, Utilities Code, redesignated as
3844 Section 101.009, Utilities Code, and amended to read as follows:
3945 Sec. 101.009 [35.102]. STATE AUTHORITY TO SELL OR CONVEY
4046 [POWER OR] NATURAL GAS. (a) In this section:
4147 (1) "Commissioner" means the commissioner of the
4248 General Land Office.
4349 (2) "Public retail customer" means a retail customer
4450 that is an agency of this state, a state institution of higher
4551 education, a public school district, a political subdivision of
4652 this state, a military installation of the United States, or a
4753 United States Department of Veterans Affairs facility.
4854 (b) The commissioner, acting on behalf of the state, may
4955 sell or otherwise convey [power or] natural gas generated from
5056 royalties taken in kind as provided by Sections 52.133(f), 53.026,
5157 and 53.077, Natural Resources Code, directly to a public retail
5258 customer [regardless of whether the public retail customer is also
5359 classified as a wholesale customer under other provisions of this
5460 title].
5561 (c) [(b)] To ensure that the state receives the maximum
5662 benefit from the sale of [power or] natural gas generated from
5763 royalties taken in kind, the commissioner shall use all feasible
5864 means to sell that [power or] natural gas first to public retail
5965 customers that are military installations of the United States,
6066 agencies of this state, institutions of higher education, or public
6167 school districts. The remainder of the [power or] natural gas, if
6268 any, may be sold to public retail customers that are political
6369 subdivisions of this state or to a United States Department of
6470 Veterans Affairs facility.
6571 SECTION 6. Section 104.2545(d), Utilities Code, is amended
6672 to read as follows:
6773 (d) In this section, "public retail customer" has the
6874 meaning assigned by Section 101.009 [35.101].
6975 SECTION 7. (a) The heading to Subchapter D, Chapter 35,
7076 Utilities Code, is repealed.
7177 (b) Sections 35.101, 35.103, 35.104, 35.105, and 35.106,
7278 Utilities Code, are repealed.
7379 SECTION 8. The General Land Office or an entity operating
7480 under a contract with the General Land Office may continue to
7581 provide retail electric service in accordance with Subchapter D,
7682 Chapter 35, Utilities Code, as that subchapter existed before the
7783 effective date of this Act, under the terms of an agreement with a
7884 customer entered into before the effective date of this Act, only
7985 until the date the agreement expires. An agreement described by
8086 this section may be extended to a date not later than January 1,
8187 2024.
8288 SECTION 9. The change in law made by this Act does not
8389 affect taxes imposed before the effective date of this Act, and the
8490 law in effect before the effective date of this Act is continued in
8591 effect for purposes of the liability for and collection of those
8692 taxes.
8793 SECTION 10. (a) As soon as practicable after January 1,
8894 2024, the Public Utility Commission of Texas, for an electric
8995 utility regulated under Chapter 36, Utilities Code, shall provide
9096 for the adjustment of the electric utility's billing of a public
9197 school district customer to reflect any decrease in the utility's
9298 tax liability to this state if the decrease is attributable to the
9399 exemption in Section 182.022(d), Tax Code, as added by this Act. An
94100 adjustment must be made effective at the same time as the decrease
95101 of tax liability or as soon after that decrease occurs as is
96102 reasonably practicable. The Public Utility Commission of Texas is
97103 not required to provide for an adjustment if the commission enters
98104 an order for the utility under Subchapter C or D, Chapter 36,
99105 Utilities Code, that accounts for any decrease in the utility's tax
100106 liability attributable to the exemption in Section 182.022(d), Tax
101107 Code, as added by this Act. An adjustment is not a rate case under
102108 Subchapter C or D, Chapter 36, Utilities Code.
103109 (b) As soon as practicable after January 1, 2024, a retail
104110 electric provider, as defined by Section 31.002, Utilities Code,
105111 shall adjust the billing of a public school district customer to
106112 reflect any decrease in the retail electric provider's tax
107113 liability to this state if the decrease is attributable to the
108114 exemption in Section 182.022(d), Tax Code, as added by this Act. An
109115 adjustment must be made effective at the same time as the decrease
110116 of tax liability or as soon after that decrease occurs as is
111117 reasonably practicable.
112118 SECTION 11. (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b) of
113119 this section, this Act takes effect immediately if it receives a
114120 vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
115121 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
116122 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
117123 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
118124 (b) Section 182.022(d), Tax Code, as added by this Act,
119125 takes effect January 1, 2024.
120- ______________________________ ______________________________
121- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
122- I certify that H.B. No. 2263 was passed by the House on April
123- 10, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, 1 present, not
124- voting.
125- ______________________________
126- Chief Clerk of the House
127- I certify that H.B. No. 2263 was passed by the Senate on
128- May 2, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
129- ______________________________
130- Secretary of the Senate
131- APPROVED: _____________________
132- Date
133- _____________________
134- Governor
126+ * * * * *