1 | | - | H.B. No. 2287 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Moody, Blanco, Ortega H.B. No. 2287 |
---|
| 2 | + | (Senate Sponsor - RodrÃguez) |
---|
| 3 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2019; |
---|
| 4 | + | April 29, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 5 | + | Intergovernmental Relations; May 19, 2019, reported adversely, |
---|
| 6 | + | with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 6, |
---|
| 7 | + | Nays 0, 1 present not voting; May 19, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 8 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 9 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2287 By: Lucio |
---|
4 | 13 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 14 | | relating to the operations of certain municipal housing |
---|
6 | 15 | | authorities. |
---|
7 | 16 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 17 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 392, Local Government |
---|
9 | 18 | | Code, is amended by adding Section 392.0162 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 19 | | Sec. 392.0162. AREA OF OPERATION OF CERTAIN MUNICIPAL |
---|
11 | 20 | | HOUSING AUTHORITIES. (a) This section applies only to the |
---|
12 | 21 | | operation of a municipal housing authority operating in a |
---|
13 | 22 | | municipality that: |
---|
14 | 23 | | (1) has a population of more than 600,000; and |
---|
15 | 24 | | (2) is located in a county that has a population of |
---|
16 | 25 | | 800,000 or more, the territorial boundary of which is contiguous to |
---|
17 | 26 | | the international border. |
---|
18 | 27 | | (b) Notwithstanding Sections 392.014 and 392.017(b), a |
---|
19 | 28 | | municipal housing authority may operate in: |
---|
20 | 29 | | (1) the municipality for which the authority is |
---|
21 | 30 | | created; and |
---|
22 | 31 | | (2) the county described by Subsection (a)(2), other |
---|
23 | 32 | | than the parts of the county: |
---|
24 | 33 | | (A) that are within the territorial boundaries of |
---|
25 | 34 | | a municipality other than the municipality for which the authority |
---|
26 | 35 | | is created; and |
---|
27 | 36 | | (B) in which another housing authority operates |
---|
28 | 37 | | under this chapter. |
---|
29 | 38 | | (c) A municipal housing authority may begin operations in |
---|
30 | 39 | | the area authorized under Subsection (b)(2) only if: |
---|
31 | 40 | | (1) the authority has completed and presented to the |
---|
32 | 41 | | commissioners court of the county described by Subsection (a)(2) a |
---|
33 | 42 | | needs assessment relating to the operation of the authority in the |
---|
34 | 43 | | county; and |
---|
35 | 44 | | (2) after a public hearing considering the needs |
---|
36 | 45 | | assessment provided under Subdivision (1), the commissioners court |
---|
37 | 46 | | votes to approve the operation of the authority in the applicable |
---|
38 | 47 | | area. |
---|
39 | 48 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
40 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
41 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
42 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2287 was passed by the House on April |
---|
43 | | - | 25, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 113, Nays 24, 1 present, not |
---|
44 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
45 | | - | No. 2287 on May 26, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 2, |
---|
46 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
47 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
48 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
49 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2287 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
50 | | - | amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 26, Nays |
---|
51 | | - | 5. |
---|
52 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
53 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
54 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
55 | | - | Date |
---|
56 | | - | __________________ |
---|
57 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 49 | + | * * * * * |
---|