Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2325 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 7, 2019

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2019

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2019

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2019
Bill April 5, 2019