Old | New | Differences | |
---|---|---|---|
1 | - | H.B. No. 2326 | |
1 | + | By: Meyer, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 2326 | |
2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019; | |
3 | + | April 15, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on | |
4 | + | Administration; May 3, 2019, reported favorably by the following | |
5 | + | vote: Yeas 4, Nays 0; May 3, 2019, sent to printer.) | |
6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote | |
2 | 7 | ||
3 | 8 | ||
9 | + | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED | |
4 | 10 | AN ACT | |
5 | 11 | relating to the continuation of a health care provider | |
6 | 12 | participation program by the Dallas County Hospital District. | |
7 | 13 | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: | |
8 | 14 | SECTION 1. Section 298A.004, Health and Safety Code, is | |
9 | 15 | amended to read as follows: | |
10 | 16 | Sec. 298A.004. EXPIRATION. (a) Subject to Section | |
11 | 17 | 298A.153(d), the authority of the district to administer and | |
12 | 18 | operate a program under this chapter expires December 31, 2025 | |
13 | 19 | [2019]. | |
14 | 20 | (b) This chapter expires December 31, 2025 [2019]. | |
15 | 21 | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. | |
16 | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ | |
17 | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House | |
18 | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2326 was passed by the House on April | |
19 | - | 10, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 126, Nays 17, 1 present, not | |
20 | - | voting. | |
21 | - | ______________________________ | |
22 | - | Chief Clerk of the House | |
23 | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2326 was passed by the Senate on May | |
24 | - | 10, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. | |
25 | - | ______________________________ | |
26 | - | Secretary of the Senate | |
27 | - | APPROVED: _____________________ | |
28 | - | Date | |
29 | - | _____________________ | |
30 | - | Governor | |
22 | + | * * * * * |