House
|
05/06/2019
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Record vote RV#1021
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Failed to pass to engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Amended 3-Ashby
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Amended 2-Springer, et al.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Motion to table fails 2-Springer, et al.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 3
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered 2-Springer, Dean, Ashby, Lang, Phelan, Clardy, Guillen, Frank, Price, K. Bell, Bailes, Hefner, More
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Amendment withdrawn 1-K. King
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2, and Rule 8, Section 10(b)
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Amendment(s) offered 1-K. King
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2019
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2019
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2019
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2019
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2019
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2019
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2019
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2019
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2019
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2019
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2019
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2019
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2019
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
11/12/2018
|
Filed
|
|
|