Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2330 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 2330
1+By: Walle, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Lucio) H.B. No. 2330
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019;
3+ April 24, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Intergovernmental Relations; May 6, 2019, reported favorably by
5+ the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 6, 2019, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to a study of an intake system and state case management
612 system for state and federal disaster assistance.
713 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
814 SECTION 1. (a) In this section:
915 (1) "Commission" means the Health and Human Services
1016 Commission.
1117 (2) "Division" means the Texas Division of Emergency
1218 Management.
1319 (b) The commission and the division shall conduct a study to
1420 determine the feasibility of developing:
1521 (1) a single intake form that would compile all
1622 information needed to obtain disaster assistance from multiple
1723 state and federal programs for an individual who needs assistance
1824 as a result of a disaster;
1925 (2) an automated intake system for collecting the
2026 information; and
2127 (3) a state case management system for disaster
2228 assistance, administered by the commission, that is similar to the
2329 Federal Emergency Management Agency case management system and
2430 includes contracting with nonprofit vendors to hire caseworkers and
2531 provide case management services.
2632 (c) The commission and the division shall coordinate with
2733 the Federal Emergency Management Agency and other appropriate state
2834 and federal agencies to conduct the study under Subsection (b) of
2935 this section. The commission and the division must determine:
3036 (1) whether the Federal Emergency Management Agency
3137 and other appropriate state and federal agencies will accept the
3238 single intake form;
3339 (2) the cost of developing the single intake form and
3440 the cost of developing and maintaining the automated intake system;
3541 and
3642 (3) the cost of developing and maintaining a state
3743 case management system and the extent to which federal
3844 reimbursement is available.
3945 (d) Not later than September 1, 2020, the commission and the
4046 division shall prepare and submit a written report to the
4147 legislature containing the findings of the study conducted under
4248 Subsection (b) of this section and any recommendations to the
4349 legislature.
4450 (e) The commission and the division may implement the single
4551 intake form, automated intake system, and state case management
4652 system if the commission and the division determine, based on the
4753 study conducted under Subsection (b) of this section, that doing so
4854 will result in no additional cost to the state.
4955 SECTION 2. This Act expires January 1, 2021.
5056 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
5157 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
5258 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
5359 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
5460 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
55- ______________________________ ______________________________
56- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
57- I certify that H.B. No. 2330 was passed by the House on April
58- 11, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 4, 2 present, not
59- voting.
60- ______________________________
61- Chief Clerk of the House
62- I certify that H.B. No. 2330 was passed by the Senate on May
63- 10, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
64- ______________________________
65- Secretary of the Senate
66- APPROVED: _____________________
67- Date
68- _____________________
69- Governor
61+ * * * * *