Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2335 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2019

                    By: Walle, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 2335
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019;
 April 17, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
 Human Services; May 19, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 May 19, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2335 By:  Campbell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the disaster supplemental nutrition assistance
 program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 33, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 33.0024 to read as follows:
 Sec. 33.0024.  DISASTER SNAP. (a)  In this section,
 "program" means the program to provide supplemental nutrition
 assistance benefits to victims of a disaster as authorized by 7
 U.S.C. Section 2014.
 (b)  The commission shall:
 (1)  in collaboration with local government officials:
 (A)  create a directory of local points of contact
 for the operation of the program;
 (B)  determine the best method for communication
 between the commission and local government officials regarding the
 program; and
 (C)  evaluate, develop, and maintain a list of
 potential sites for in-person application for program benefits that
 meet federal requirements;
 (2)  enter into memorandums of understanding with local
 government agencies documenting the roles and responsibilities of
 the commission and each local government agency regarding the
 determination of the need for and the location of sites for
 in-person application for program benefits; and
 (3)  provide information regarding the program and
 strategies for effective collaboration between local governments
 and the commission to local government officials in coastal
 counties by hosting webinars, conducting conference calls, or
 holding in-person meetings.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *