1 | | - | H.B. No. 2335 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Walle, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Kolkhorst) H.B. No. 2335 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | April 17, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Health & |
---|
| 4 | + | Human Services; May 19, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 19, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2335 By: Campbell |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to the disaster supplemental nutrition assistance |
---|
6 | 14 | | program. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 33, Human Resources Code, |
---|
9 | 17 | | is amended by adding Section 33.0024 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 18 | | Sec. 33.0024. DISASTER SNAP. (a) In this section, |
---|
11 | 19 | | "program" means the program to provide supplemental nutrition |
---|
12 | 20 | | assistance benefits to victims of a disaster as authorized by 7 |
---|
13 | 21 | | U.S.C. Section 2014. |
---|
14 | 22 | | (b) The commission shall: |
---|
15 | 23 | | (1) in collaboration with local government officials: |
---|
16 | 24 | | (A) create a directory of local points of contact |
---|
17 | 25 | | for the operation of the program; |
---|
18 | 26 | | (B) determine the best method for communication |
---|
19 | 27 | | between the commission and local government officials regarding the |
---|
20 | 28 | | program; and |
---|
21 | 29 | | (C) evaluate, develop, and maintain a list of |
---|
22 | 30 | | potential sites for in-person application for program benefits that |
---|
23 | 31 | | meet federal requirements; |
---|
24 | 32 | | (2) enter into memorandums of understanding with local |
---|
25 | 33 | | government agencies documenting the roles and responsibilities of |
---|
26 | 34 | | the commission and each local government agency regarding the |
---|
27 | 35 | | determination of the need for and the location of sites for |
---|
28 | 36 | | in-person application for program benefits; and |
---|
29 | 37 | | (3) provide information regarding the program and |
---|
30 | 38 | | strategies for effective collaboration between local governments |
---|
31 | 39 | | and the commission to local government officials in coastal |
---|
32 | 40 | | counties by hosting webinars, conducting conference calls, or |
---|
33 | 41 | | holding in-person meetings. |
---|
34 | 42 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
35 | 43 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
36 | 44 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
37 | 45 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
38 | 46 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
39 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
40 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
41 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2335 was passed by the House on April |
---|
42 | | - | 11, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 6, 2 present, not |
---|
43 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
44 | | - | No. 2335 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 139, Nays 3, |
---|
45 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
46 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
47 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
48 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2335 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
49 | | - | amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
50 | | - | 0. |
---|
51 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
52 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
53 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
54 | | - | Date |
---|
55 | | - | __________________ |
---|
56 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 47 | + | * * * * * |
---|