1 | | - | H.B. No. 2363 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Harris, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Birdwell) H.B. No. 2363 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 2, 2019; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 8, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on State |
---|
| 4 | + | Affairs; May 20, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 20, 2019, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2363 By: Birdwell |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to permitting certain foster homes to store firearms and |
---|
6 | 14 | | ammunition in the same locked location. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Section 42.042(e-1), Human Resources Code, is |
---|
9 | 17 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 18 | | (e-1) The commission [department] may not prohibit |
---|
11 | 19 | | possession of lawfully permitted firearms and ammunition in an |
---|
12 | 20 | | agency foster home. Minimum standards may be adopted under this |
---|
13 | 21 | | section relating to safety and proper storage of firearms and |
---|
14 | 22 | | ammunition. The minimum standards must allow [, including |
---|
15 | 23 | | standards requiring] firearms and ammunition to be stored |
---|
16 | 24 | | separately or stored together in the same locked location if the |
---|
17 | 25 | | firearms are stored with a trigger locking device attached to the |
---|
18 | 26 | | firearms [locations]. |
---|
19 | 27 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. |
---|
20 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
21 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
22 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2363 was passed by the House on May 2, |
---|
23 | | - | 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 97, Nays 43, 1 present, not |
---|
24 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
25 | | - | No. 2363 on May 24, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 85, Nays 56, |
---|
26 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
27 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
28 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
29 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 2363 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
30 | | - | amendments, on May 21, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 24, Nays |
---|
31 | | - | 7. |
---|
32 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
33 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
34 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
35 | | - | Date |
---|
36 | | - | __________________ |
---|
37 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 28 | + | * * * * * |
---|