Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2368 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-86R24656 MM-F
1+86R12293 MM-F
22 By: Miller H.B. No. 2368
3- Substitute the following for H.B. No. 2368:
4- By: Frank C.S.H.B. No. 2368
53
64
75 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
86 AN ACT
97 relating to access to and the provision of behavioral and mental
108 health care services and trauma-informed care in the Medicaid
119 managed care program.
1210 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1311 SECTION 1. Sections 533.0051(a) and (d), Government Code,
1412 are amended to read as follows:
1513 (a) The commission shall establish outcome-based
1614 performance measures and incentives to include in each contract
1715 between a health maintenance organization and the commission for
1816 the provision of health care services, including behavioral and
1917 mental health care services, to recipients that is procured and
2018 managed under a value-based purchasing model. The performance
2119 measures and incentives must:
2220 (1) be designed to facilitate and increase recipients'
2321 access to appropriate health care services, including behavioral
2422 and mental health care services; [and]
2523 (2) to the extent possible, align with other state and
2624 regional quality care improvement initiatives; and
2725 (3) for contracts for the provision of behavioral and
2826 mental health care services to recipients under the STAR Health
2927 program, be designed to facilitate and increase recipients' access
3028 to trauma-informed care.
3129 (d) Subject to Subsection (f), the commission shall assess
3230 the feasibility and cost-effectiveness of including provisions in a
3331 contract described by Subsection (a) that require the health
3432 maintenance organization to provide to the providers in the
3533 organization's provider network pay-for-performance opportunities
3634 that support quality improvements in the care of recipients.
3735 Pay-for-performance opportunities may include incentives for
3836 providers to provide care after normal business hours and to
3937 participate in the early and periodic screening, diagnosis, and
4038 treatment program and other activities that improve recipients'
4139 access to care, including trauma-informed care and behavioral and
4240 mental health care services. If the commission determines that the
4341 provisions are feasible and may be cost-effective, the commission
4442 shall develop and implement a pilot program in at least one health
4543 care service region under which the commission will include the
4644 provisions in contracts with health maintenance organizations
4745 offering managed care plans in the region.
4846 SECTION 2. Section 533.0052, Government Code, is amended by
49- amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (c), (d), and (e) to
50- read as follows:
47+ amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (c), (d), (e), (f),
48+ and (g) to read as follows:
5149 (a) A contract between a managed care organization and the
5250 commission for the organization to provide health care services,
5351 including behavioral and mental health care services, to recipients
5452 under the STAR Health program must include a requirement that
5553 [trauma-informed care training be offered to] each contracted
5654 physician or provider who diagnoses or provides treatment for a
5755 behavioral or mental health condition or prescribes psychotropic
5856 medication receive training regarding the impact of trauma on
5957 children and trauma-informed care.
6058 (c) The commission shall determine the appropriate
6159 information to include in the training required by Subsection (a).
6260 The training must include information regarding:
6361 (1) the effects of trauma, toxic stress, and adverse
6462 childhood experiences on a child's:
6563 (A) brain development; and
66- (B) cognitive, emotional, psychological,
67- physical, and behavioral functioning;
64+ (B) emotional, cognitive, and social
65+ functioning;
6866 (2) trauma screening and accessing a child's trauma
6967 history;
70- (3) the management of traumatic memories and
71- trauma-related symptoms;
68+ (3) the management of traumatic memories;
7269 (4) the overlap between symptoms of trauma and
7370 symptoms of mental health disorders, including
7471 attention-deficit/hyperactivity disorder, bipolar disorder, and
7572 oppositional defiant disorder;
7673 (5) the potential risks of using psychotropic
7774 medication for children who have experienced trauma;
78- (6) the availability of research-supported or
79- evidence-based, trauma-informed, non-pharmacological
80- interventions;
75+ (6) the availability of research-supported,
76+ trauma-informed, non-pharmacological interventions; and
8177 (7) appropriate coding and billing procedures for
82- reimbursement of trauma-informed care, treatments, and services;
83- and
84- (8) the impact of trauma on children with an
85- intellectual or developmental disability.
78+ reimbursement of trauma-informed care, treatments, and services.
8679 (d) The commission shall make at least one opportunity to
8780 receive the training required by Subsection (a) available at no
88- cost to each physician or provider described by Subsection (a) with
89- whom a contract is entered into or renewed.
90- (e) The commission may establish performance measures and
81+ cost to each contracted physician or provider described by
82+ Subsection (a).
83+ (e) A contracted physician or provider described by
84+ Subsection (a) who has received the training required by that
85+ subsection before September 1, 2019, may meet the training
86+ requirement by providing documentation to the commission of the
87+ relevant training. This subsection expires September 1, 2020.
88+ (f) Notwithstanding any other law, a contracted physician
89+ or provider described by Subsection (a) is not required to meet the
90+ training requirement of this section before September 1, 2020.
91+ This subsection expires September 1, 2021.
92+ (g) The commission may establish performance measures and
9193 incentives described by Section 533.0051 to encourage improved
9294 access to trauma-informed care and behavioral and mental health
9395 care services for recipients under the STAR Health program and to
9496 support contracted physicians or providers described by Subsection
9597 (a) in receiving:
9698 (1) training required by Subsection (a); and
97- (2) additional training in research-supported or
98- evidence-based, trauma-informed, non-pharmacological
99- interventions.
99+ (2) additional training in research-supported,
100+ trauma-informed, non-pharmacological interventions.
100101 SECTION 3. Not later than January 1, 2020, the executive
101102 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
102103 adopt rules necessary to implement Sections 533.0051 and 533.0052,
103104 Government Code, as amended by this Act.
104105 SECTION 4. (a) Sections 533.0051 and 533.0052, Government
105106 Code, as amended by this Act, apply only to a contract between the
106107 Health and Human Services Commission and a managed care
107108 organization that is entered into or renewed on or after the
108109 effective date of this Act.
109110 (b) To the extent permitted by law or the terms of the
110111 contract, the Health and Human Services Commission shall amend a
111112 contract entered into before the effective date of this Act with a
112113 managed care organization to comply with Sections 533.0051 and
113114 533.0052, Government Code, as amended by this Act.
114- SECTION 5. (a) Notwithstanding Section 533.0052,
115- Government Code, as amended by this Act, a physician or provider is
116- not required to complete the training described by that section
117- before September 1, 2023.
118- (b) The implementation of the training described by Section
119- 533.0052, Government Code, as amended by this Act, must align with
120- the transition of the Department of Family and Protective Services
121- to a trauma-informed system of care as required by H.B. No. 1536 or
122- similar legislation of the 86th Legislature, Regular Session, 2019,
123- if that bill or similar legislation is enacted and becomes law.
124- SECTION 6. If before implementing any provision of this Act
115+ SECTION 5. If before implementing any provision of this Act
125116 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
126117 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
127118 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
128119 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
129120 waiver or authorization is granted.
130- SECTION 7. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
121+ SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.