Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2379 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/25/2019

                            86R9847 JG-D
 By: Raymond H.B. No. 2379


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to changes to and the setting of fees, charges, and rates
 under the Medicaid and child health plan programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 531.02112 to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.02112.  PROCEDURE FOR IMPLEMENTING CHANGES TO
 PAYMENT RATES UNDER MEDICAID AND CHILD HEALTH PLAN PROGRAM. (a) In
 adopting rules and standards related to the determination of fees,
 charges, and rates for payments under Medicaid and the child health
 plan program, the executive commissioner, in consultation with the
 advisory committee established under Subsection (b), shall adopt
 rules to ensure that changes to the fees, charges, and rates are
 implemented in accordance with this section and in a way that
 minimizes administrative complexity and financial uncertainty.
 (b)  The executive commissioner shall establish an advisory
 committee of nine members to provide input for the adoption of rules
 and standards that comply with this section. The advisory
 committee is composed of representatives from managed care
 organizations and providers, including physicians, under Medicaid
 and the child health plan program. The advisory committee is
 abolished on the date the rules that comply with this section are
 adopted. This subsection expires September 1, 2021.
 (c)  Before implementing a change to the fees, charges, and
 rates for payments under Medicaid or the child health plan program,
 the commission shall:
 (1)  before or at the time notice of the proposed change
 is published under Subdivision (2), notify managed care
 organizations and the entity serving as the state's Medicaid claims
 administrator under the Medicaid fee-for-service delivery model of
 the proposed change;
 (2)  publish notice of the proposed change:
 (A)  for public comment in the Texas Register for
 a period of not less than 30 days; and
 (B)  on the commission's and state Medicaid claims
 administrator's Internet websites during the period specified
 under Paragraph (A);
 (3)  publish notice of a final determination to make
 the proposed change:
 (A)  in the Texas Register for a period of not less
 than 30 days before the change becomes effective; and
 (B)  on the commission's and state Medicaid claims
 administrator's Internet websites during the period specified
 under Paragraph (A); and
 (4)  provide managed care organizations and the entity
 serving as the state's Medicaid claims administrator under the
 Medicaid fee-for-service delivery model with a period of not less
 than 30 days before the effective date of the final change to make
 any necessary administrative or systems adjustments to implement
 the change.
 (d)  If changes to the fees, charges, or rates for payments
 under Medicaid or the child health plan program are mandated by the
 legislature or federal government on a date that does not fall
 within the time frame for the implementation of those changes
 described by this section, the commission shall:
 (1)  prorate the amount of the change over the fee,
 charge, or rate period; and
 (2)  publish the proration schedule described by
 Subdivision (1) in the Texas Register along with the notice
 provided under Subsection (c)(3).
 (e)  This section does not apply to changes to the fees,
 charges, or rates for payments made to a nursing facility.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 533, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 533.0059 to read as follows:
 Sec. 533.0059.  RESTRICTIONS ON CERTAIN REIMBURSEMENT RATE
 REDUCTIONS. (a)  In this section, "across-the-board provider
 reimbursement rate reduction" means a provider reimbursement rate
 reduction proposed by a managed care organization that the
 commission determines is likely to affect more than 50 percent of a
 particular type of provider participating in the organization's
 provider network during the 12-month period following
 implementation of the proposed reduction, regardless of whether:
 (1)  the organization limits the proposed reduction to
 specific service areas or provider types; or
 (2)  the affected providers are likely to experience
 differing percentages of rate reductions or amounts of lost revenue
 as a result of the proposed reduction.
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (e), a managed care
 organization that contracts with the commission to provide health
 care services to recipients may not implement a significant, as
 determined by the commission, across-the-board provider
 reimbursement rate reduction unless the organization:
 (1)  at least 90 days before the proposed rate
 reduction is to take effect:
 (A)  provides the commission and affected
 providers with written notice of the proposed rate reduction; and
 (B)  makes a good faith effort to negotiate the
 reduction with the affected providers; and
 (2)  receives prior approval from the commission,
 subject to Subsection (c).
 (c)  An across-the-board provider reimbursement rate
 reduction is considered to have received the commission's prior
 approval for purposes of Subsection (b)(2) unless the commission
 issues a written statement of disapproval not later than the 45th
 day after the date the commission receives notice of the proposed
 rate reduction from the managed care organization under Subsection
 (b)(1)(A).
 (d)  If a managed care organization proposes an
 across-the-board provider reimbursement rate reduction in
 accordance with this section and subsequently rejects alternative
 rate reductions suggested by an affected provider, the organization
 must provide the provider with written notice of that rejection,
 including an explanation of the grounds for the rejection, before
 implementing any rate reduction.
 (e)  This section does not apply to rate reductions that are
 implemented because of reductions to the Medicaid fee schedule or
 cost containment initiatives that are specifically directed by the
 legislature and implemented by the commission.
 SECTION 3.  Section 2, Chapter 1117 (H.B. 3523), Acts of the
 84th Legislature, Regular Session, 2015, which amended Section
 533.00251(c), Government Code, effective September 1, 2021, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 4.  Not later than December 31, 2019, the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall
 establish the advisory committee as required by Section
 531.02112(b), Government Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 5.  (a)  Not later than December 31, 2020, the
 executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission
 shall adopt the rules required to implement Section 531.02112,
 Government Code, as added by this Act.
 (b)  The procedure for implementing changes to payment rates
 required by Section 531.02112, Government Code, as added by this
 Act, applies only to a change to a fee, charge, or rate that takes
 effect on or after January 1, 2021.
 SECTION 6.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.